EP1513747 - APPARATUS FOR TRANSPORTING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bakvertisi Limited 5 Fenton Street Eden Terrace Auckland / NZ | [2009/33] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Bakvertisi Limited 5 Fenton Street Eden Terrace, Auckland / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAKER, John, Russell 4/38 Inkerman Street Onehunga, 1006 Auckland / NZ | 02 /
CALVERT, Alan, Sydney 27 Valley Road, RD 1 1250 Waimauku / NZ | 03 /
TULISI, Sandra, Louise 75/88 Cotlew Street East Southport QLD 4215 / AU | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al R G C Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03725913.2 | 13.05.2003 | [2005/11] | WO2003NZ00090 | Priority number, date | NZ20020518940 | 13.05.2002 Original published format: NZ 51894002 | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03095339 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1513747 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1513747 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 20.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/02, B65G1/12, B65G1/137, B65G47/10, B65G57/00, B65G59/00, B65G61/00 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
B65G1/0407 (EP);
B65G1/1375 (EP);
B65G1/1378 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRANSPORT VON BEHÄLTERN | [2005/11] | English: | APPARATUS FOR TRANSPORTING CONTAINERS | [2005/11] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRANSPORT DE CONTENANTS | [2005/11] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 17.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   06.06.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.08.2009 | BE | 12.08.2009 | CY | 12.08.2009 | CZ | 12.08.2009 | DK | 12.08.2009 | EE | 12.08.2009 | FI | 12.08.2009 | IT | 12.08.2009 | NL | 12.08.2009 | RO | 12.08.2009 | SE | 12.08.2009 | SI | 12.08.2009 | SK | 12.08.2009 | TR | 12.08.2009 | BG | 12.11.2009 | GR | 13.11.2009 | ES | 23.11.2009 | PT | 12.12.2009 | HU | 13.02.2010 | IE | 13.05.2010 | LU | 13.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CY | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
HU | 13.02.2010 | ||
IE | 13.05.2010 | ||
LU | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CY | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
HU | 13.02.2010 | ||
IE | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CY | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
IE | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IT | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
BE | 12.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 12.08.2009 | |
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2844263 (DREYER JOHN A) [A] 1,3,8,11,17,20,25 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]JPS6145826 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD) [A] 1,17* abstract *; | [YA]EP0369547 (STAALKAT BV [NL]) [Y] 1,17,25 * column 5, line 21 - column 7, line 35 * * column 10, line 55 - column 11, line 3 * [A] 2,3,5,11,20; | [YA]FR2673923 (JOULIN AERO DISTRIBUTION [FR]) [Y] 1,17,25 * page 6, line 1 - line 25; figures 5-7 * [A] 3,4,6,8,11,14,15,19,20,22 | International search | [A]US5558483 (MASUDA JUNICHI [JP]); | [A]US6061607 (BRADLEY ROBERT E [US], et al); | [A]EP1122194 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE [US]); | [A]US6321138 (LIVESAY MARK F [US], et al); | [AP]WO02059021 (BAKVERTISI LTD [NZ], et al) |