EP1509467 - DISPLACEMENT MEASUREMENT SYSTEM AND SHEET FEED SYSTEM INCORPORATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VEJTASA, David S 3551 Middlefield Road Atherton, CA 94025 / US | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct London EC1A 2BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03726830.7 | 08.05.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003US14965 | Priority number, date | US20020142392 | 08.05.2002 Original published format: US 142392 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03095345 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1509467 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1509467 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65H7/12 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
B65H7/12 (EP,US);
B65H2511/13 (EP,US);
B65H2511/212 (EP,US);
B65H2511/515 (EP,US);
B65H2511/524 (EP,US);
B65H2553/40 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/13, B65H2220/03 (EP,US);
B65H2511/212, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/11 (US,EP);
B65H2511/515, B65H2220/03 (US,EP);
B65H2511/524, B65H2220/03 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/35] |
Former [2005/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEGMESSSYSTEM UND DIESES ENTHALTENDES BOGENZUFÜHRSYSTEM | [2005/09] | English: | DISPLACEMENT MEASUREMENT SYSTEM AND SHEET FEED SYSTEM INCORPORATING THE SAME | [2005/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DU DEPLACEMENT ET DISPOSITIF D'APPROVISIONNEMENT EN FEUILLES UTILISANT CE DISPOSITIF | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 04.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH11106094 ; | [X]WO8101827 (NCR CO [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]US4420747 (KISTNER WERNER [DE]); | [XY]US4491929 (IKOMA TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9,10 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 4 * * column 4, line 1 - line 7 * * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 8; figure - * [Y] 2; | [A]US5029837 (UCHIYAMA TADAMITSU [JP]); | [Y]EP0548874 (NEOPOST IND [FR]) [Y] 2 * page 3, line 6 - line 29; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11106094 A 19990420 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 3-7 * abstract * |