EP1506582 - METHOD FOR THE POST-TREATMENT OF A PHOTOVOLTAIC CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konarka Austria Forschungs-und Entwicklungs GMBH Gruberstrasse 40-42 4010 Linz / AT | [2005/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARICIFTCI, Serdar Pachmayrstrasse 135 A-4040 Linz / AT | 02 /
GLÖTZL, Erhard Karl-Kautsky-Weg 26 A-4040 Linz / AT | 03 /
DENK, Patrick Lüfteneggerstrasse 8/5/29 A-4020 Linz / AT | 04 /
RITTBERGER, Roman Zülowstrasse 5 A-4040 Linz / AT | 05 /
PADINGER, Franz Margaritenweg 2 4502 St Marien / AT | [2005/33] |
Former [2005/07] | 01 /
SARICIFTCI, Serdar Pachmayrstrasse 135 A-4040 Linz / AT | ||
02 /
GLÖTZL, Erhard Karl-Kautsky-Weg 26 A-4040 Linz / AT | |||
03 /
DENK, Patrick Lüfteneggerstrasse 8/5/29 A-4020 Linz / AT | |||
04 /
RITTBERGER, Roman Zülowstrasse 5 A-4040 Linz / AT | |||
05 /
PADINGER, Franz Wiener Strasse 46 A-4490 St. Florian / AT | Representative(s) | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Regus Business Center Landsberger Strasse 155 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/07] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03726984.2 | 06.05.2003 | [2005/07] | WO2003AT00131 | Priority number, date | AT20020000775 | 22.05.2002 Original published format: AT 7752002 | [2005/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03098715 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1506582 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1506582 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/42 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
H10K30/30 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
H10K71/40 (EP,US);
H10K30/50 (EP);
H10K85/113 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/07] | H01L51/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR NACHBEHANDLUNG EINER PHOTOVOLTAISCHEN ZELLE | [2005/07] | English: | METHOD FOR THE POST-TREATMENT OF A PHOTOVOLTAIC CELL | [2005/07] | French: | PROCEDE DE POST-TRAITEMENT D'UNE CELLULE PHOTOVOLTAIQUE | [2005/07] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/07] | 06.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.12.2010 | CZ | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | FI | 22.12.2010 | HU | 22.12.2010 | IE | 22.12.2010 | IT | 22.12.2010 | NL | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SE | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | TR | 22.12.2010 | BG | 22.03.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | ES | 02.04.2011 | PT | 22.04.2011 | AT | 06.05.2011 | GB | 06.05.2011 | LU | 06.05.2011 | BE | 31.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | FR | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
AT | 06.05.2011 | ||
GB | 06.05.2011 | ||
LU | 06.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
AT | 06.05.2011 | ||
GB | 06.05.2011 | ||
LU | 06.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
AT | 06.05.2011 | ||
GB | 06.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
GB | 06.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/22] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 22.12.2010 | |
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10150234 ; | [A]WO9835393 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al); |