EP1492597 - TRAINING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/01] | METHOD FOR CONDUCTING A TARGETED TRAINING AND A CORRESPONDING TRAINING DEVICE | ||
[2012/22] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolli, Engelbert Im Schüle 38A 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Ruckh Jurastraße 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Fabrikstrasse 18 73277 Owen/Teck / DE | ||
Former [2005/01] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard, Dr. Fabrikstrasse 18 73277 Owen/Teck / DE | Application number, filing date | 03727176.4 | 04.04.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003DE01123 | Priority number, date | DE20021015622 | 09.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10215622 | DE20031000253 | 03.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10300253 | [2005/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03084616 | Date: | 16.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1492597 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1492597 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/04] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1492597 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A63B23/035, A63B23/02 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A63B22/0056 (EP,US);
A63B22/06 (KR);
A63B22/0002 (EP,US);
A63B22/0005 (EP,US);
A63B22/001 (EP,US);
A63B22/0012 (EP,US);
A63B22/0605 (EP,US);
A63B22/205 (EP,US);
A63B23/0222 (EP,US);
A63B23/0227 (EP,US);
A63B2022/0629 (EP,US);
A63B2022/0652 (EP,US);
A63B2023/003 (EP,US);
A63B2069/167 (EP,US);
A63B21/225 (EP,US);
A63B22/02 (EP,US);
A63B2208/12 (EP,US);
A63B2225/15 (EP,US);
A63B24/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | TRAININGSGERÄT | [2012/22] | English: | TRAINING DEVICE | [2012/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT | [2012/22] |
Former [2005/01] | VERFAHREN FÜR EIN GEZIELTES TRAINING UND TRAININGSGERÄT | ||
Former [2005/01] | METHOD FOR CONDUCTING A TARGETED TRAINING AND A CORRESPONDING TRAINING DEVICE | ||
Former [2005/01] | METHODE D'ENTRAINEMENT CIBLE ET DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.10.2009
26.10.2009
ADMISSIBLE Lautenschläger, Peter Höhenstrasse 10 67724 Gonbach / DE Opponent's representative Schmitt, Meinrad, et al, et al Reble & Klose Rechts- und Patentanwälte Konrad-Zuse-Ring 32 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.10.2009
26.10.2009
ADMISSIBLE Lautenschläger, Peter Höhenstrasse 10 67724 Gonbach / DE Opponent's representative Schmitt, Meinrad, et al, et al Reble & Klose Rechts- und Patentanwälte Konrad-Zuse-Ring 32 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.10.2009
Lautenschläger, Peter Höhenstrasse 10 76724 Gonbach / DE Opponent's representative Szymanowski, Carsten, et al, et al Reble & Klose Patente + Marken Sophienstraße 17 D-68165 Mannheim / DE | 25.11.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.05.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.11.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.12.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.12.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.04.2012 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.01.2009 | CZ | 21.01.2009 | EE | 21.01.2009 | FI | 21.01.2009 | IE | 21.01.2009 | RO | 21.01.2009 | SI | 21.01.2009 | SK | 21.01.2009 | TR | 21.01.2009 | LU | 04.04.2009 | BG | 21.04.2009 | GR | 22.04.2009 | BE | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | PT | 22.06.2009 | HU | 22.07.2009 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 21.01.2009 | |
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
IE | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
LU | 04.04.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
HU | 22.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 21.01.2009 | |
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
IE | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
LU | 04.04.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 21.01.2009 | |
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
IE | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 21.01.2009 | |
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
IE | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CZ | 21.01.2009 | |
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
IE | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | CZ | 21.01.2009 | |
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
IE | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CZ | 21.01.2009 | |
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
IE | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | CZ | 21.01.2009 | |
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
IE | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | FI | 21.01.2009 | |
IE | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | FI | 21.01.2009 | |
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 21.01.2009 | |
SI | 21.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE3447829 (BRUNNENKANT WALTER DIPL ING) [Y] 5 * figure 1 *; | [X]US5947873 (SANDS LEONARD [US], et al) [X] 1,3,8-10,33,34 * column W *; | [X]US6066076 (WANG MEI-SAN [TW], et al) [X] 1,3,8,10,11,33,34 * column W *; | [A]GB2349099 (AKHMETOV ZINNUR BORISOVICH [GB]); | [XY]US6149552 (CHEN PAUL [TW]) [X] 1-4,8,9,11 * column W * [Y] 5 |