EP1508031 - A METHOD AND A SPECTROMETER FOR QUANTITATIVE DETERMINATION OF A CONSTITUENT IN A SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOSS Analytical A/S Slangerupgade 69 P.O.Box 260 3400 Hilleroed / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states FOSS Analytical A/S Slangerupgade 69 P.O.Box 260 3400 Hilleroed / DK | ||
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states FOSS Analytical A/S Slangerupgade 69, P.O.Box 260 3400 Hilleroed / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ridder, Carsten Slotsvej 64, Karlby 8543 Hornslet / DK | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2009/17] |
Former [2008/31] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | ||
Former [2005/08] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen O / DK | Application number, filing date | 03727246.5 | 28.05.2003 | [2005/08] | WO2003DK00355 | Priority number, date | DK20020000817 | 28.05.2002 Original published format: DK 200200817 | [2005/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03100394 | Date: | 04.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1508031 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1508031 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/27 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
G01N21/274 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SPEKTROMETER ZUR QUANTITATIVEN BESTIMMUNG EINES BESTANDTEILS IN EINER PROBE | [2005/08] | English: | A METHOD AND A SPECTROMETER FOR QUANTITATIVE DETERMINATION OF A CONSTITUENT IN A SAMPLE | [2005/08] | French: | PROCEDE ET SPECTROMETRE PERMETTANT LA DETERMINATION QUANTITATIVE D'UN CONSTITUANT DANS UN ECHANTILLON | [2005/08] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 20.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.05.2009 | CY | 06.05.2009 | CZ | 06.05.2009 | EE | 06.05.2009 | FI | 06.05.2009 | SI | 06.05.2009 | SK | 06.05.2009 | IE | 28.05.2009 | LU | 28.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | BG | 06.08.2009 | GR | 07.08.2009 | PT | 06.09.2009 | HU | 07.11.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 28.05.2009 | ||
LU | 28.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
HU | 07.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 28.05.2009 | ||
LU | 28.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 28.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
IE | 28.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4236075 (FRANDSEN ANDREAS S [DK], et al) [DA] 18-22,25,28,29,33 * column 1, line 7 - line 14 * * column 2, line 8 - line 34 * * column 2, line 56 - line 62 * * column 8, line 39 - column 9, line 48 * * column 11, line 45 - line 49 ** figure 6; claims 1,4,5,22 *; | [A]US5243546 (MAGGARD STEVEN M [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 1, line 6 - line 16 * * column 7, line 37 - line 47 * * column 8, line 38 - line 61 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US5708593 (SABY CLAUDE-ALAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 1, line 6 - line 15 * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 17 * |