EP1514127 - PROBEHEAD FOR NMR SPECTROMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEEMILISE JA BIOLOOGILISE FÜÜSIKA INSTITUUT Akadeemia tee 23 EE12618 Tallinn / EE | [2005/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMOSON, Ago Trummi 34L EE12617 Tallinn / EE | 02 /
TUHERM, Tiit Vilde tee 143-21 EE12613 Tallinn / EE | 03 /
PAST, Jaan Sütiste tee 34-49 EE13411 Tallinn / EE | 04 /
REINHOLD, Andres Trummi 34F EE12617 Tallinn / EE | 05 /
ANUPOLD, Tiit S pruse pst. 243-39 EE13420 Tallinn / EE | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Pikkor, Riho Patendibüroo Turvaja OÜ Liivalaia 22 10118 Tallinn / EE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | Pikkor, Riho Patendibüroo Turvaja OÜ Liivalaia 22 10118 Tallinn / EE | Application number, filing date | 03727260.6 | 14.05.2003 | [2005/11] | WO2003EE00002 | Priority number, date | EE20020000025U | 30.05.2002 Original published format: EE 200200025 U | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03102615 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1514127 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1514127 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/30 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
G01R33/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/38] |
Former [2005/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PROBENKOPF FÜR NMR-SPEKTROMETER | [2005/11] | English: | PROBEHEAD FOR NMR SPECTROMETER | [2005/11] | French: | TETE DE SONDE POUR SPECTROMETRE A RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE NUCLEAIRE | [2005/11] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 22.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.05.2011 | [2012/22] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0020085 (VARIAN ASSOCIATES [US]); | [DX]US4254373 (LIPPMAA ENDEL T, et al); | [A]WO9215023 (DOTY SCIENT INC [US]); | by applicant | US4254373 |