EP1509308 - DEVICE FOR FILTERING FLUIDS THAT ARE CONVEYED UNDER A HIGH PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kamat-Pumpen GmbH + Co. KG Salingerfeld 10 58431 Witten-Annen / DE | [2005/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLF, Wilhelm, Paul Robert-Geritzmann-Höfe 54 45883 Gelsenkirchen / DE | 02 /
SPRAKEL, Jan, G. Viktoriastrasse 4 42929 Wermelskirchen / DE | [2006/15] |
Former [2005/09] | 01 /
WOLF, Wilhelm, Paul Althoff-Strasse 9 C 48151 Münster / DE | ||
02 /
SPRAKEL, Jan, G. Viktoriastrasse 4 42929 Wermelskirchen / DE | Representative(s) | Simons, Johannes Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Simons, Johannes, Dipl.-Ing. COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03727474.3 | 14.05.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003EP05032 | Priority number, date | DE2002124634 | 04.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10224634 | [2005/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03101583 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1509308 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1509308 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/31 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
B01D63/06 (EP,US);
B01D35/31 (EP,US);
B01D65/00 (EP,US);
B29C48/694 (EP,US);
B01D2201/304 (EP,US);
B01D2313/21 (EP,US);
B29C48/03 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM FILTERN VON UNTER EINEM HOHEN DRUCK GEFÖRDERTEN FLUIDEN | [2005/09] | English: | DEVICE FOR FILTERING FLUIDS THAT ARE CONVEYED UNDER A HIGH PRESSURE | [2005/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FILTRATION DE FLUIDES ACHEMINES SOUS HAUTE PRESSION | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 04.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.09.2006 | CZ | 20.09.2006 | EE | 20.09.2006 | IE | 20.09.2006 | NL | 20.09.2006 | RO | 20.09.2006 | SI | 20.09.2006 | SK | 20.09.2006 | TR | 20.09.2006 | BG | 20.12.2006 | SE | 20.12.2006 | GR | 21.12.2006 | ES | 31.12.2006 | PT | 12.03.2007 | HU | 21.03.2007 | LU | 14.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | CY | 20.09.2006 | |
CZ | 20.09.2006 | ||
EE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
RO | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
LU | 14.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
EE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
RO | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
RO | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
GR | 21.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
RO | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
RO | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
RO | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
IT | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
SK | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
IE | 20.09.2006 | ||
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 20.09.2006 | |
NL | 20.09.2006 | ||
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 20.09.2006 | |
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
ES | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 20.09.2006 | |
SI | 20.09.2006 | ||
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | SI | 20.09.2006 | |
BG | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]RU1834688 ; | [A]US3307854 (HATFIELD PAUL E); | [A]FR91999E ; | [A]US5609757 (SCHIAVO JOHN J [US], et al); | [A]FR2799259 (DUPONT GEORGES [FR]); | [XP]DE10224634 (KAMAT PUMPEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | Examination | US2801751 |