EP1626290 - IMAGE-ACQUISITION MODULE SUITABLE FOR MONITORING THE EXTERNAL ENVIRONMENT OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/07] | IMAGE-ACQUISITION MODULE WHICH IS INTENDED FOR MONITORING THE EXTERNAL ENVIRONMENT OF A VEHICLE | ||
[2011/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fico Mirrors, S.A. 98, Gran Via Carles III 08028 Barcelona / ES | [2006/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIGUEL SANZ, Santiago@c/Sant Francesc Xavier, 22 E-08905 L'Hospitalet de Llobregat Barcelona / ES | 02 /
BANDE MARTINEZ, Daniel c/Constitució,93 E-08014 Barcelona / ES | [2011/40] |
Former [2006/07] | 01 /
MIGUEL SANZ, Santiago c/Sant Francesc Xavier, 22 E-08905 L'Hospitalet de Llobregat Barcelona / ES | ||
02 /
BANDE MARTINEZ, Daniel c/Constitució,93 E-08014 Barcelona / ES | Representative(s) | Gislon, Gabriele Torner, Juncosa i Associats, S.L. C/Pau Claris, 108, 1r 1a 08009 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Gislon, Gabriele Torner, Juncosa i Associats, S.L. C/Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes, 669bis 1è 2º 08013 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2006/07] | Gislon, Gabriele Torner, Juncosa i Associats, S.L. c/ Bruc, 21 08010 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 03727516.1 | 22.05.2003 | [2006/07] | WO2003ES00240 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004104626 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1626290 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1626290 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01S11/12, B60R21/00, H04N7/18 | [2006/07] | CPC: |
B60R11/04 (EP,US);
G01S3/781 (EP);
H04N23/51 (EP,US);
H04N23/52 (EP,US);
H04N23/54 (EP,US);
H04N23/57 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Title | German: | BILDERFASSUNGSMODUL, DAS FÜR DIE ÜBERWACHUNG DES AEUSSEREN UMFELDS EINES FAHRZEUGS GEEIGNET IST | [2011/32] | English: | IMAGE-ACQUISITION MODULE SUITABLE FOR MONITORING THE EXTERNAL ENVIRONMENT OF A VEHICLE | [2011/29] | French: | MODULE D'ACQUISITION D'IMAGE CONVENABLE POUR LA SURVEILLANCE DE L'EXTERIEUR D'UN VEHICULE | [2011/29] |
Former [2006/07] | BILDERFASSUNGSMODUL, DAS F R DIE BERWACHUNG DES ûUSSEREN UMFELDS EINES FAHRZEUGS BESTIMMT IST | ||
Former [2006/07] | IMAGE-ACQUISITION MODULE WHICH IS INTENDED FOR MONITORING THE EXTERNAL ENVIRONMENT OF A VEHICLE | ||
Former [2006/07] | MODULE D'ACQUISITION D'IMAGE DESTINE A LA SURVEILLANCE DE L'EXTERIEUR D'UN VEHICULE | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2005 | Translation filed | 11.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 27.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 26.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2003 | AT | 05.10.2011 | BE | 05.10.2011 | CY | 05.10.2011 | CZ | 05.10.2011 | DK | 05.10.2011 | EE | 05.10.2011 | FI | 05.10.2011 | IT | 05.10.2011 | NL | 05.10.2011 | RO | 05.10.2011 | SI | 05.10.2011 | SK | 05.10.2011 | TR | 05.10.2011 | BG | 05.01.2012 | GR | 06.01.2012 | PT | 06.02.2012 | GB | 22.05.2012 | IE | 22.05.2012 | LU | 22.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | FR | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
GB | 22.05.2012 | ||
IE | 22.05.2012 | ||
LU | 22.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
GB | 22.05.2012 | ||
IE | 22.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
GB | 22.05.2012 | ||
IE | 22.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
GB | 22.05.2012 | ||
IE | 22.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
GB | 22.05.2012 | ||
IE | 22.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | SI | 05.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2002341432 ; | [A]US5172235 (WILM THOMAS [DE], et al); | [A]EP0582236 (TAKATA CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0591743 (GILARDINI SPA [IT]); | [A]WO0161371 (FICO MIRRORS SA [ES], et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP2002341432 A 20021127 (MURAKAMI CORP) | Examination | JPS59199343 | EP0761500 | WO03010967 | by applicant | JPS59199343 | EP0591743 | JP2002341432 | WO03010967 |