EP1497351 - LOW-VISCOSITY POLYISOCYANATE COMPOSITION HAVING HIGH FUNCTIONALITY AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Opposition rejected | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHODIA CHIMIE 26, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92510 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2008/41] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Rhodia Chimie 26, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92510 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNARD, Jean-Marie Route du Large, Saint-Laurent d'Agny F-69440 MORNANT / FR | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Colombet, Alain André, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Colombet, Alain André, et al Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03727617.7 | 27.03.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003FR00976 | Priority number, date | FR20020003877 | 27.03.2002 Original published format: FR 0203877 | [2005/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03080697 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1497351 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1497351 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/79, C08G18/02, C07D251/34 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
C07D403/06 (EP,US);
C08G18/79 (KR);
C07D229/00 (EP,US);
C07D251/34 (EP,KR,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
C08G18/02 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NIEDRIGE VISKOSITÄT UND HOHE FUNKTIONALITÄT AUFWEISENDE POLYISOCYANATZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2005/03] | English: | LOW-VISCOSITY POLYISOCYANATE COMPOSITION HAVING HIGH FUNCTIONALITY AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME | [2005/03] | French: | COMPOSITION POLYISOCYANATE DE FAIBLE VISCOSITE POSSEDANT UNE FONCTIONNALITE ELEVEE ET PROCEDE DE PREPARTION | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 11.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.07.2009
ADMISSIBLE Bayer MaterialScience AG Law and Patents Patents and Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.07.2009
ADMISSIBLE Bayer MaterialScience AG Law and Patents, Patents and Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | 12.08.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.12.2011 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 04.04.2015 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2015/22] | Appeal following opposition | 06.02.2012 | Appeal received No. T0318/12 | 24.02.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent inadmissible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.10.2008 | CZ | 08.10.2008 | DK | 08.10.2008 | EE | 08.10.2008 | FI | 08.10.2008 | IE | 08.10.2008 | RO | 08.10.2008 | SI | 08.10.2008 | SK | 08.10.2008 | TR | 08.10.2008 | BG | 08.01.2009 | SE | 08.01.2009 | GR | 09.01.2009 | PT | 18.02.2009 | LU | 27.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | HU | 09.04.2009 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 08.10.2008 | |
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LU | 27.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
HU | 09.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 08.10.2008 | |
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LU | 27.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 08.10.2008 | |
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | CZ | 08.10.2008 | |
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CZ | 08.10.2008 | |
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CZ | 08.10.2008 | |
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | DK | 08.10.2008 | |
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | DK | 08.10.2008 | |
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 08.10.2008 | |
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | SI | 08.10.2008 | |
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/16] | SI | 08.10.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0478990 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 9 - line 54; claims 1,2; table 1 *; | [A]EP0645411 (NIPPON POLYURETHANE KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 37 - line 44 ** page 3, line 13 - line 35; claim 1; table 3 *; | [X]DE19603245 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 50 - page 4, line 28 * * page 5, line 35 - line 63; claim 1 *; | [X]WO9907765 (RHODIA CHIMIE SA [FR], et al) [X] 1 * page 13, line 19 - page 16, line 19; examples 4-6; claims 1-8 * |