EP1500167 - ENERGY SOURCE COMMUNICATION EMPLOYING SLOT ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mineral Lassen LLC 2215-B Renaissance Drive, Suite 5 Las Vegas NV 89119 / US | [2008/35] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Mineral Lassen LLC 2215-B Renaissance Drive, Suite 5 Las Vegas, NV 89119 / US | ||
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states Marconi Intellectual Property (US) Inc. 333 Pierce Road, Suite 370 Itasca, IL 60143 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSTER, Ian, James 31 Great Cob, Springfield Chelmsford, Essex CM1 5LA / GB | 02 /
KING, Patrick, E. 418 North Park Boulevard Glen Ellyn, IL 60137 / US | 03 /
GINN, Michael, G. Ramor, Riffhams Lane, Danbury Chelmsford, Essex CM3 4DS / GB | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Weber-Bruls, Dorothée, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/15] | Weber-Bruls, Dorothée, Dr., et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/04] | Hoste, Colin Francis, et al Marconi Intellectual Property Crompton Close Basildon, Essex SS14 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03727807.4 | 24.04.2003 | [2005/04] | WO2003IB02252 | Priority number, date | US20020375258P | 24.04.2002 Original published format: US 375258 P | [2005/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03092116 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1500167 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1500167 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q13/10, H01Q13/18, H01Q1/22, H01Q1/44, H01Q1/24, G06K19/077 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
H01Q1/2225 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
H01Q1/22 (EP,US);
H01Q1/242 (EP,US);
H01Q1/44 (EP,US);
H01Q13/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/04] | H01Q13/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEQUELLENKOMMUNIKATION MIT EINER SCHLITZANTENNE | [2005/04] | English: | ENERGY SOURCE COMMUNICATION EMPLOYING SLOT ANTENNA | [2005/04] | French: | COMMUNICATION PAR UNE SOURCE D'ENERGIE METTANT EN OEUVRE UNE ANTENNE A FENTE | [2005/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 30.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.01.2008 | 16.01.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.01.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.08.2008 | BE | 27.08.2008 | CY | 27.08.2008 | CZ | 27.08.2008 | DK | 27.08.2008 | EE | 27.08.2008 | FI | 27.08.2008 | IT | 27.08.2008 | NL | 27.08.2008 | RO | 27.08.2008 | SI | 27.08.2008 | SK | 27.08.2008 | TR | 27.08.2008 | BG | 27.11.2008 | SE | 27.11.2008 | GR | 28.11.2008 | ES | 08.12.2008 | PT | 27.01.2009 | HU | 28.02.2009 | IE | 24.04.2009 | LU | 24.04.2009 | CH | 30.04.2009 | LI | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
HU | 28.02.2009 | ||
IE | 24.04.2009 | ||
LU | 24.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
IE | 24.04.2009 | ||
LU | 24.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
IE | 24.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
IE | 24.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 27.08.2008 | |
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 27.08.2008 | |
ES | 08.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2334624 (MOTOROLA ISRAEL LTD [IL]) [X] 1-34* page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 34; figure 1 *; | [X]FR2806198 (SAGEM [FR]) [X] 1-34 * page 3, line 1 - line 11; figure 1 * | Examination | EP0297790 | EP0971410 |