EP1499119 - IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND IMAGE PROCESSING PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONDO, Tetsujiro, SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
KIKUCHI, Daisuke, SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03727995.7 | 25.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003JP05403 | Priority number, date | JP20020124312 | 25.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002124312 | JP20020130592 | 02.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002130592 | JP20020167677 | 07.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002167677 | [2005/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03092276 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1499119 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1499119 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/66 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
H04N9/12 (EP,US);
H04N5/66 (KR);
G09G5/36 (KR);
G09G5/377 (KR);
H04N5/145 (EP,US);
H04N5/147 (EP,US);
H04N9/3147 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/44] |
Former [2005/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM | [2005/03] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND IMAGE PROCESSING PROGRAM | [2005/03] | French: | APPAREIL, PROCEDE ET LOGICIEL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2003 | Translation filed | 18.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2003 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 28.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5262856 (LIPPMAN ANDREW B [US], et al) [A] 1,10,11,19,20 * abstract * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 58 * * column 17, line 39 - column 18, line 61; figure 9 *; | [A]GB2354388 (INDEPENDENT TELEVISION COMMISS [GB]) [A] 1,10,11,19,20 * page 14, line 24 - page 16, line 1; figure 1 ** page 21, line 17 - page 22, line 7; figure 4 * | International search | [X]WO9802844 (SARNOFF CORP [US]); | [A]JPH08191411 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | US5262856 |