EP1508993 - INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD, INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD, RECORDING MEDIUM, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iino, Yoichiro c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Naoki c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Robinson, Nigel Alexander Julian, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2005/08] | Pilch, Adam John Michael, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03728022.9 | 02.05.2003 | [2005/08] | WO2003JP05605 | Priority number, date | JP20020149925 | 24.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002149925 | JP20030069304 | 14.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003069304 | [2005/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03101042 | Date: | 04.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1508993 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, G09C1/00 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
H04L63/062 (EP,US);
H04L9/32 (KR);
G09C1/00 (KR);
H04L63/0807 (EP,US);
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
H04L9/007 (EP,US);
H04L9/08 (KR);
H04L9/3263 (EP,US);
H04L9/3273 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/37] |
Former [2005/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN, AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND PROGRAMM | [2005/08] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD, INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD, RECORDING MEDIUM, AND PROGRAM | [2005/08] | French: | PROCEDE, SYSTEME ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT ET PROGRAMME | [2005/08] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2004 | Translation filed | 23.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 26.08.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH09212553 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH10149396 (ADVANCE CO LTD); | [X]JPH10336172 (KYUSHU SYST JOHO GIJUTSU KENKY, et al); | [A]JPH11355268 (SONY CORP); | [X]JP2000138674 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000268097 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JP2000299682 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001119390 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JP2002139998 (SONY CORP) |