EP1645002 - FUEL CELL, ELECTRODE CATALYST AND ELECTRODE FOR FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Kyu-Jung, Hyundae town House Na-101 Gumi-Dong, Bundang-Gu Seongnam, Gyeonggi-Do 463-500 / KR | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Palmer, Jonathan R. Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | Palmer, Jonathan R. Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03728148.2 | 22.05.2003 | [2006/15] | WO2003KR01011 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004105163 | Date: | 02.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1645002 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/90 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
H01M4/90 (EP,US);
H01M4/8605 (EP,US);
H01M8/1007 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLE, ELEKTRODENKATALYSATOR UND ELEKTRODE FÜR EINE BRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2006/15] | English: | FUEL CELL, ELECTRODE CATALYST AND ELECTRODE FOR FUEL CELL | [2006/15] | French: | PILE A COMBUSTIBLE, CATALYSEUR D'ELECTRODE ET ELECTRODE POUR PILE A COMBUSTIBLE | [2006/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 21.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 20.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/17] | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.07.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002064709 (OVSHINSKY STANFORD R [US], et al); | [A]US6492056 (OVSHINSKY STANFORD R [US]) |