EP1504124 - LDL RECEPTOR-RELATED PROTEINS 1 AND 2 AND TREATMENT OF BONE OR CARTILAGE CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cornish, Jillian 60 B Godden Crescent Mission Bay Auckland / NZ | For all designated states Reid, Ian Reginald 7 Maybeck road Mount Albert Auckland / NZ | For all designated states Palmano, Kay Patricia 85 Buick Crescent Palmerston North / NZ | For all designated states Grey, Andrew Bevis 26 Seascape road Remuera Auckland / NZ | For all designated states Naot, Dorit 75 Avonleigh road Green Bay Auckland / NZ | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Cornish, Jillian 60 B Godden Crescent Mission Bay, Auckland / NZ | ||
For all designated states Reid, Ian Reginald 7 Maybeck road Mount Albert, Auckland / NZ | |||
For all designated states Palmano, Kay Patricia 85 Buick Crescent Palmerston North / NZ | |||
For all designated states Grey, Andrew Bevis 26 Seascape road Remuera, Auckland / NZ | |||
For all designated states Naot, Dorit 75 Avonleigh road Green Bay, Auckland / NZ | |||
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states Cornish, Jillian 23 Joseph Banks Terrace Newmarket, Auckland / NZ | ||
For all designated states Reid, Ian Reginald 7 Maybeck road Mount Albert, Auckland / NZ | |||
For all designated states Palmano, Kay Patricia 85 Buick Crescent Palmerston North / NZ | |||
For all designated states Grey, Andrew Bevis 26 Seascape road Remuera, Auckland / NZ | |||
For all designated states Naot, Dorit 75 Avonleigh road Green Bay, Auckland / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/06] | Brown, John David, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03728178.9 | 13.05.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003NZ00087 | Priority number, date | US20020380227P | 13.05.2002 Original published format: US 380227 P | US20030463419P | 16.04.2003 Original published format: US 463419 P | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03095678 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1504124 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 20.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07K14/71, G01N33/53 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/12 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/18 (EP);
A61P5/46 (EP);
G01N33/92 (EP,US);
G01N2500/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LDL-REZEPTOR-VERWANDTE PROTEINE 1 UND 2 UND BEHANDLUNG VON KNOCHEN- ODER KNORPELERKRANKUNGEN | [2005/06] | English: | LDL RECEPTOR-RELATED PROTEINS 1 AND 2 AND TREATMENT OF BONE OR CARTILAGE CONDITIONS | [2005/06] | French: | PROTEINES 1 ET 2 ASSOCIEES AUX RECEPTEURS DES LIPOPROTEINES DE FAIBLE DENSITE (LDL) ET TRAITEMENT DE PATHOLOGIES OSSEUSES OU CARTILAGINEUSES | [2005/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 26.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 17.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/36] | 17.03.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.03.2011 | 17.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.04.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 02.04.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   17.08.2010 | 31.05.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07138188 ; | [X]WO0076552 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US]) [X] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0157266 (HYSEQ INC [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * pages 54-56 *; | [X]WO0192474 (UNIV CONNECTICUT HEALTH CT [US]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * page 7 * * pages 12-13; claims 1-12,96 *; | [A]WO0216553 (AVENTIS PHARMA SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [E]WO03106657 (STOWERS INST FOR MEDICAL RES [US]) [E] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2004033657 (ANTIGENICS INC [US], et al) [E] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [X] - "Oral compsn. for treatment of parodontosis - comprises alpha-2-macro:globulin, to inhibit bone resorption due to endotoxin of pathogenic bacteria of parodontosis", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 30, Database accession no. 1995-228641, XP002376839 & JPH07138188 A 19950530 ((LIOY ) LION CORP) [X] 1-18 * column A * | [A] - STRICKLAND DUDLEY K ET AL, "Diverse roles for the LDL receptor family.", TRENDS IN ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (200203), vol. 13, no. 2, ISSN 1043-2760, pages 66 - 74, XP002376834 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1043-2760(01)00526-4 | [T] - GREY ANDREW ET AL, "The low-density lipoprotein receptor-related protein 1 is a mitogenic receptor for lactoferrin in osteoblastic cells", MOLECULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, (200409), vol. 18, no. 9, ISSN 0888-8809, pages 2268 - 2278, XP002376835 [T] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/me.2003-0456 | [T] - CORNISH J ET AL, "Lactoferrin and bone: an overview of recent progress", AUSTRALIAN JOURNAL OF DAIRY TECHNOLOGY, (200504), vol. 60, no. 1, ISSN 0004-9433, pages 53 - 57, XP009065252 [T] 1-18 * the whole document * | [T] - NIEMEIER ANDREAS ET AL, "Identification of megalin/gp330 as a receptor for lipoprotein(a) in vitro", ARTERIOSCLEROSIS THROMBOSIS AND VASCULAR BIOLOGY, (199903), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 1079-5642, pages 552 - 561, XP009065102 [T] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1359/JBMR.041102 | International search | [X]WO0203985 (UNIV SAINT LOUIS [US], et al); | [A] - KATO M. ET AL., "Cbfa1-independent decrease in osteoblast proliferation, osteopenia and persistent embryonic eye vascularization in mice deficient in Lrp5, a Wnt coreceptor", JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (20020415), vol. 157, pages 303 - 314, XP008070712 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.200201089 | [A] - LITTLE R.D. ET AL., "A mutation in the LDL receptor-related protein 5 gene results in the autosomal dominant high-bone-mass trait", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, (200201), vol. 70, pages 11 - 19, XP002287932 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1086/338450 |