EP1493107 - CONTENT AGGREGATION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ON-LINE PURCHASING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CBS Interactive Inc. 2711 Centerville Road Suite 400 County of New Castle Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2009/13] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Cnet Networks, Inc. 235 Second Street 94105 San Francisco / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUSGROVE, Timothy, Allen 275 Berkshire Drive Morgan, Hill, CA 95037 / US | 02 /
WALSH, Robin, Hiroko 512 Ramsell Street San Francisco, CA 94132 / US | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Potter, Julian Mark, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Potter, Julian Mark, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03728349.6 | 08.04.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003US10706 | Priority number, date | US20020119311 | 10.04.2002 Original published format: US 119311 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03088086 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1493107 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06F16/951 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0603 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0605 (EP,US);
Y10S707/922 (US);
Y10S707/948 (US);
Y10S707/959 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INHALTSANSAMMLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN ONLINE-KAUFSYSTEM | [2005/01] | English: | CONTENT AGGREGATION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ON-LINE PURCHASING SYSTEM | [2005/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE GROUPAGE DE CONTENU POUR SYSTEME D'ACHATS EN DIRECT | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 30.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | 27.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0186377 (AMERICAN FREEWAY INC D B A SMA [US]) [I] 1-42 * abstract * * page 6, line 4 - line 20 * * page 8, line 18 - line 30 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2002038255 (TARVYDAS MARTIN K [US], et al) [A] 1-42 * abstract * * paragraph [0088] ** claim 1 * | International search | [Y]US5920854 (KIRSCH STEVEN T [US], et al); | [A]US6125352 (FRANKLIN D CHASE [US], et al); | [Y]US6154738 (CALL CHARLES GAINOR [US]); | [A]US6304864 (LIDDY ELIZABETH D [US], et al); | [YP]US6405175 (NG DAVID WAY [US]) | by applicant | US5895454 |