EP1508068 - A SHEET AND METHODS FOR FILTERING ELECTROMAGNETIC VISUAL, AND MINIMIZING ACOUSTIC TRANSMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/08] | A SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR FILTERING ELECTROMAGNETIC VISUAL, AND MINIMIZING ACOUSTIC TRANSMISSIONS | ||
[2011/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astic Signals Defenses, LLC 5917 Liberty Road Baltimore, MD 21207 / US | For all designated states CPFilms, Inc. P.O.Box 5068 Martinsville, VA 24115 / US | [2012/27] |
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states Simpson, Deron 1973 Orkney Drive Finksburg, MD 21048 / US | ||
For all designated states Winckler, Lisa 741 Colonial Drive Collinsville, VA 24078 / US | |||
For all designated states Spraker, Ronald L. 910 Glade Street Martinville, VA 24112 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simpson, Deron 1973 Orkney Drive Finksburg, MD 21048 / US | 02 /
Winckler, Lisa 741 Colonial Drive Collinsville, VA 24078 / US | 03 /
Spraker, Ronald L. 910 Glade Street Martinville, VA 24112 / US | [2012/27] |
Former [2005/08] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/08] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03728613.5 | 28.05.2003 | [2005/08] | WO2003US13408 | Priority number, date | US20020383114P | 28.05.2002 Original published format: US 383114 P | US20020395332P | 12.07.2002 Original published format: US 395332 P | [2005/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03102686 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1508068 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1508068 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/33, H05K9/00 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
H05K9/0094 (EP,US);
B32B17/10045 (EP,US);
B32B17/10174 (EP,US);
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
G02B5/208 (EP,US);
G02B5/22 (EP,US);
G06F21/55 (EP,US);
G06F21/62 (EP,US);
Y04S40/20 (EP);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B32B17/10005, B32B2367/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/08] | G02F1/33 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/08] | Title | German: | FOLIE UND VERFAHREN ZUM FILTERN ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER VISUELLER UND ZUM MINIMIEREN AKUSTISCHER ÜBERTRAGUNGEN | [2011/52] | English: | A SHEET AND METHODS FOR FILTERING ELECTROMAGNETIC VISUAL, AND MINIMIZING ACOUSTIC TRANSMISSIONS | [2011/52] | French: | FILM ET PROCEDES DE FILTRAGE DE TRANSMISSIONS ELECTROMAGNETIQUES VISUELLES ET DE REDUCTION AU MINIMUM DES TRANSMISSIONS ACOUSTIQUES | [2011/52] |
Former [2005/08] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM FILTERN ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER VISUELLER UND ZUM MINIMIEREN AKUSTISCHER ÜBERTRAGUNGEN | ||
Former [2005/08] | A SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR FILTERING ELECTROMAGNETIC VISUAL, AND MINIMIZING ACOUSTIC TRANSMISSIONS | ||
Former [2005/08] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDES DE FILTRAGE DE TRANSMISSIONS ELECTROMAGNETIQUES VISUELLES ET DE REDUCTION AU MINIMUM DES TRANSMISSIONS ACOUSTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 05.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 20.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.09.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.05.2003 | AT | 11.07.2012 | BE | 11.07.2012 | CY | 11.07.2012 | CZ | 11.07.2012 | DK | 11.07.2012 | EE | 11.07.2012 | FI | 11.07.2012 | MC | 11.07.2012 | NL | 11.07.2012 | RO | 11.07.2012 | SE | 11.07.2012 | SI | 11.07.2012 | SK | 11.07.2012 | TR | 11.07.2012 | BG | 11.10.2012 | GR | 12.10.2012 | PT | 12.11.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
TR | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0975207 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) | International search | [A]US5218472 (JOZEFOWICZ MARK A [CA], et al); | [Y]US5763063 (PASS THOMAS [US], et al); | [X]US6157486 (BENSON JR OLESTER [US], et al); | [A]US6392782 (BLOEMER MARK J [US], et al) |