EP1503652 - VASCULARIZATION ENHANCED GRAFT CONSTRUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Purdue Research Foundation 3000 Kent Avenue West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION 3000 Kent Avenue West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BADYLAK, Stephen, Francis 1150 Kingswood Road South West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Elsy, David, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | Elsy, David, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03728631.7 | 01.05.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003US13541 | Priority number, date | US20020377566P | 02.05.2002 Original published format: US 377566 P | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03092474 | Date: | 13.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1503652 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61K35/12, A61K35/37, C12N5/00 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
C12N5/0697 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
C12N5/069 (EP,US);
A61K35/12 (EP,US);
C12N2501/135 (EP,US);
C12N2501/15 (EP,US);
C12N2501/165 (EP,US);
C12N2502/1347 (EP,US);
C12N2502/23 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/06] | A61B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCH VASKULARISIERUNG VERSTÄRKTE PROTHESENKONSTRUKTE | [2005/06] | English: | VASCULARIZATION ENHANCED GRAFT CONSTRUCTS | [2005/06] | French: | GREFFONS HYBRIDES A VASCULARISATION AMELIOREE | [2005/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 03.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/48] | 23.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/48] | 07.07.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP09163405.5 / EP2103684 | EP09163422.0 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 16.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0015765 (BADYLAK STEPHEN F [US], et al) [Y] 1-31 * page 1, line 4 - line 8 * * page 2, line 3 - line 7 * * page 3, line 21 - line 27 * * page 5, line 3 - line 5 * * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 11 * * page 8, line 1 - page 11, line 2 * * claims 1-15 *; | [Y]WO0148153 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US]) [Y] 1-31 * page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 1 * * page 7, line 6 - line 22 * * page 14, line 20 - page 16, line 2 * * claims 1-30 *; | [A] - BADYLAK ET AL, "Endothelial cell adherence to small intestinal submucosa: an acellular bioscaffold", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (1999), vol. 20, no. 23/24, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 2257 - 2263, XP002194052 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0142-9612(99)00156-8 | International search | [XP]US6485723 (BADYLAK STEPHEN F [US], et al); | [Y]US6375989 (BADYLAK STEPHEN F [US], et al); | [A]US6171344 (ATALA ANTHONY [US]) |