EP1472020 - WASHER FOR TANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Sun Hydrocorps Company, LLC 3436 St. Peters Road, St. Peters Road St. Peters, PA 19470-0428 / US | [2012/12] |
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Devon Cleaning Systems, LLC 3436 St. Peters Road, St. Peters Road St. Peters, PA 19470-0428 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBINSON, Michael 1178 Grovania Avenue Abington, PA 19001 / US | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/45] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Eastcheap House Central Approach Letchworth Garden City, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 03729614.2 | 09.01.2003 | [2004/45] | WO2003US00653 | Priority number, date | US20020347287P | 09.01.2002 Original published format: US 347287 P | [2004/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03059541 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1472020 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1472020 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.07.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/08 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
B05B3/16 (EP,US);
B08B9/093 (EP,US);
B08B9/0936 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18568 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18592 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/45] | Title | German: | WASCHVORRICHTUNG FÜR BEHÄLTER | [2004/45] | English: | WASHER FOR TANKS | [2004/45] | French: | APPAREIL DE LAVAGE POUR RESERVOIRS | [2004/45] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 13.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 16.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 16.02.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 16.02.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.02.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.06.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   05.07.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.01.2003 | AT | 21.03.2012 | BE | 21.03.2012 | CY | 21.03.2012 | CZ | 21.03.2012 | DK | 21.03.2012 | EE | 21.03.2012 | FI | 21.03.2012 | NL | 21.03.2012 | SE | 21.03.2012 | SI | 21.03.2012 | SK | 21.03.2012 | TR | 21.03.2012 | BG | 21.06.2012 | GR | 22.06.2012 | ES | 02.07.2012 | PT | 23.07.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | GR | 22.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0172689 (ROBINSON MICHAEL) [X] 1-4,9 * page 2, line 9 - page 10, line 26 * * claims 1,2 ** figure - * | International search | [X]US3696825 (GUIGNON JOHN E, et al); | [Y]US5720310 (MOULDER JEFFREY ERNEST [US]) |