EP1465511 - DISPENSING APPARATUS WITH DIRECTIONAL LED LIGHTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 30.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company One Coca-Cola Plaza N.W. Atlanta, GA 30313 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states THE COCA-COLA COMPANY One Coca-Cola Plaza N.W. Atlanta, GA 31313 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUDICK, Arthur, G. 1328 Lexox Circle Atlanta, GA 30306 / US | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Jackson, Robert Patrick Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03729667.0 | 14.01.2003 | [2004/42] | WO2003US01119 | Priority number, date | US20020047354 | 14.01.2002 Original published format: US 47354 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03060839 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1465511 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A47F3/04 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
A47F1/12 (EP,US);
A47F3/001 (EP,US);
A47F3/0404 (EP,US);
A47F3/0426 (EP,US);
A47F3/0486 (EP,US);
G07F11/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGABEVORRICHTUNG MIT DIREKTIONALEN LED BELEUCHTUNG | [2004/42] | English: | DISPENSING APPARATUS WITH DIRECTIONAL LED LIGHTING | [2004/42] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DOTE D'UN ECLAIRAGE LED DIRECTIONNEL | [2004/42] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 23.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/13] | 16.10.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.11.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/13] | Appeal following examination | 18.12.2006 | Appeal received No. T0394/07 | 26.02.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.11.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 15.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.11.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.10.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0160216 (COCA COLA CO [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 3, line 6 - line 10 * * page 4, line 5 - line 14 * * page 7, line 12 - line 16 * * page 9, line 1 - line 2 * * figure 2 *; | [X]WO0100065 (ANTHONY INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 6, line 6 - line 19 * * page 8, line 5 - line 11 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5392953 (MALDANIS ALGERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4977754 (UPTON RONALD D [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 14, line 67 - column 15, line 4 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US6266963 (RUDICK ARTHUR G [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * |