EP1514088 - MICROSCOPE SLIDE COVER WITH INTEGRATED RESERVOIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Biosystems Melbourne Pty Ltd 495 Blackburn Road Mt Waverley, VIC 3149 / AU | [2011/40] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Vision Biosystems Limited 495 Blackburn Road Mt Waverley, Victoria 3149 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCLELLAN, Andrew 110 Broughton Road Surrey Hills, Victoria 3127 / AU | 02 /
GORIS, George 53 Fieldstone Boulevard Beaconsfield, Victoria 3807 / AU | 03 /
HENDERSON, Chester Private Bag 107 495 Blackburn Road Mount Waverley, Victoria 3149 / AU | 04 /
MCKINLAY, Jonathan 2/2a Auburn Grove Hawthorn East, Victoria 3123 / AU | [2018/08] |
Former [2005/11] | 01 /
MCLELLAN, Andrew 110 Broughton Road Surrey Hills, Victoria 3127 / AU | ||
02 /
GORIS, George 53 Fieldstone Boulevard Beaconsfield, Victoria 3807 / AU | |||
03 /
HENDERSON, Chester Private Bag 107, 495 Blackburn Road Mount Waverley, Victoria 3149 / AU | |||
04 /
MCKINLAY, Jonathan 2/2a Auburn Grove Hawthorn East, Victoria 3123 / AU | Representative(s) | Naismith, Robert Stewart, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [2018/08] |
Former [2005/11] | Naismith, Robert Stewart, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 03729709.0 | 20.06.2003 | [2005/11] | WO2003AU00778 | Priority number, date | AU2002PS03090 | 20.06.2002 Original published format: AU PS309002 | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004001389 | Date: | 31.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1514088 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1514088 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 31.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, G01N1/31, G01N35/00, G02B21/34, G01N1/28, B01L9/00 | [2017/35] | CPC: |
G02B21/34 (EP,US);
B01L3/508 (EP,US);
B01L9/52 (EP,US);
B01L2300/021 (EP,US);
B01L2300/045 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0822 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0406 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00138 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25 (EP,US);
Y10T436/2575 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/45] | G01N1/31, G01N35/00, G02B21/34, G01N1/28 | ||
Former IPC [2005/11] | G01N1/31, G01N35/00, G02B21/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/08] |
Former [2005/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MIKROSKOP-OBJEKTTRÄGERABDECKUNG MIT INTEGRIERTEM RESERVOIR | [2005/11] | English: | MICROSCOPE SLIDE COVER WITH INTEGRATED RESERVOIR | [2005/11] | French: | COUVERCLE DE LAMELLE DE MICROSCOPE A RESERVOIR INTEGRE | [2005/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 04.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 16.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.10.2017 | 30.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   08.12.2006 | 30.06.2008 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2008 | 30.06.2010 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2003 | AT | 21.02.2018 | CY | 21.02.2018 | CZ | 21.02.2018 | DK | 21.02.2018 | EE | 21.02.2018 | ES | 21.02.2018 | FI | 21.02.2018 | IT | 21.02.2018 | MC | 21.02.2018 | NL | 21.02.2018 | PT | 21.02.2018 | RO | 21.02.2018 | SE | 21.02.2018 | SI | 21.02.2018 | SK | 21.02.2018 | TR | 21.02.2018 | BG | 21.05.2018 | GR | 22.05.2018 | IE | 20.06.2018 | LU | 20.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/28] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 20.06.2018 | ||
LU | 20.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 20.06.2018 | ||
LU | 20.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 20.06.2018 | ||
LU | 20.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
IE | 20.06.2018 | ||
LU | 20.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
LU | 20.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0047189 (PREVO DONALD L) [X] 1-3,6,13-26 * the whole document * [I] 1-26; | [XI]EP0310399 (SHANDON SCIENT LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,6,13-15,17-21,23 * the whole document *[I] 1-23; | [XAI]EP0479231 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,13,14,17-20,23 * column 3, line 15 - column 6, line 36; figures 9-10 * [A] 24-26 [I] 1-23; | [XI]WO9739328 (AUSTRALIAN BIOMEDICAL [AU], et al) [X] 1-3,6,13-20,23-26 * page 5, line 38 - page 6, line 26; figures 1-3 * [I] 1-26 | International search | [A]JPS6319532 ; | [A]GB2127577 (V TECH INC); | [A]US4790640 (NASON FREDERIC L [US]); | [A]US6118582 (DEL BUONO STEVEN CARLOS [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP63019532 A 19880127 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) | by applicant | EP0047189 | EP0310399 | EP0479231 | WO9739328 | AU2003PS03114 |