EP1638711 - EMBOSSING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR EMBOSSING WORKPIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERNST GROB AG Rohrgasse 9 CH-8708 Männedorf / CH | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GESER, Peter Trübelstrasse 42 CH-8712 Stäfa / CH | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | TSWpat Luzern AG Postfach 3414 6002 Luzern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Kemény AG Patentanwaltbüro Postfach 3414 6002 Luzern / CH | Application number, filing date | 03729769.4 | 24.06.2003 | [2006/13] | WO2003CH00411 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004112982 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1638711 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1638711 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B21D17/02, B44B5/00 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
B21D17/02 (EP);
B44B5/0028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRÄGEMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUM PRÄGEN VON WERKSTÜCKEN | [2006/13] | English: | EMBOSSING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR EMBOSSING WORKPIECES | [2006/13] | French: | MACHINE ET PROCEDE D'ESTAMPAGE DE PIECES | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 15.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.08.2007 | CZ | 01.08.2007 | DK | 01.08.2007 | EE | 01.08.2007 | FI | 01.08.2007 | GB | 01.08.2007 | IE | 01.08.2007 | NL | 01.08.2007 | RO | 01.08.2007 | SI | 01.08.2007 | SK | 01.08.2007 | TR | 01.08.2007 | BG | 01.11.2007 | SE | 01.11.2007 | GR | 02.11.2007 | ES | 12.11.2007 | PT | 02.01.2008 | HU | 02.02.2008 | FR | 28.03.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 01.08.2007 | |
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
GB | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
HU | 02.02.2008 | ||
FR | 28.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 01.08.2007 | |
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
GB | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
FR | 28.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 01.08.2007 | |
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
GB | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
FR | 28.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 01.08.2007 | |
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
GB | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
FR | 28.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 01.08.2007 | |
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
GB | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
FR | 28.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 01.08.2007 | |
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
GB | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 01.08.2007 | |
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
GB | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 01.08.2007 | |
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 01.08.2007 | |
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 01.08.2007 | |
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 01.08.2007 | |
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 12.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP1074320 (GROB ERNST FA [CH]) [DA] 1* the whole document * |