EP1503786 - A METHOD OF INHIBITING THE EMIGRATION OF CELLS FROM THE INTRAVASCULAR COMPARTMENT INTO TISSUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPF Pharmaceuticals GmbH Feodor-Lynen-Str. 31 30625 Hannover / DE | [2005/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSSMANN, Ulf, IPF PharmaCeuticals GmbH Feodor-Lynen-Str. 31 30625 Hannover / DE | 02 /
ELSNER, Jörn Lister Meile 57 D-30161 Hannover / DE | 03 /
ESCHER, Sylvia Fundstr. 8 D-30161 Hannover / DE | 04 /
SPODSBERG, Nikolaj Nonnetofte Alle 7 DK-2500 Copenhagen / DK | [2005/15] |
Former [2005/06] | 01 /
FORSSMANN, Ulf, IPF PharmaCeuticals GmbH Feodor-Lynen-Str. 31 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
02 /
ELSNER, Jörn Pickertsberg 35 D-31515 Wunstorf / DE | |||
03 /
ESCHER, Sylvia Liebigstr. 6 D-30163 Hannover / DE | |||
04 /
SPODSBERG, Nikolaj Rautenstr. 20 D-30171 Hannover / DE | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte P.O. Box 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 03729998.9 | 09.05.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003EP04872 | Priority number, date | EP20020010573 | 10.05.2002 Original published format: EP 02010573 | EP20020011201 | 21.05.2002 Original published format: EP 02011201 | US20020381802P | 21.05.2002 Original published format: US 381802 P | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03094950 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1503786 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/19, A61K38/17, A61K38/07, A61K31/557, A61P37/06, A61P29/00 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
A61K38/195 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/557 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/35] |
Former [2005/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR HEMMUNG DER EMIGRATION VON ZELLEN AUS DEM INTRAVASKULÄREN KOMPARTIMENT INS GEWEBE | [2005/06] | English: | A METHOD OF INHIBITING THE EMIGRATION OF CELLS FROM THE INTRAVASCULAR COMPARTMENT INTO TISSUES | [2005/06] | French: | PROCEDE VISANT A INHIBER L'EMIGRATION DES CELLULES DU COMPARTIMENT INTRAVASCULAIRE DANS LES TISSUS | [2005/06] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 06.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 04.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1167527 (EUROSCREEN SA [BE], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0061] * * claims 1-6,20-22 * [Y] 1-16; | [Y] - DETHEUX M ET AL, "Natural proteolytic processing of hemofiltrate CC chemokine 1 generates a potent CC chemokine receptor (CCR)1 and CCR5 agonist with anti-HIV properties.", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE. UNITED STATES 20 NOV 2000, (20001120), vol. 192, no. 10, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 1501 - 1508, XP002241991 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.192.10.1501 | [Y] - MUENCH JAN ET AL, "Hemofiltrate CC chemokine 1(9-74) causes effective internalization of CCR5 and is a potent inhibitor of R5-tropic human immunodeficiency virus type 1 strains in primary T cells and macrophages.", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, April, 2002, (200204), vol. 46, no. 4, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 982 - 990, XP002241992 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.46.4.982-990.2002 | [A] - TERAN L M, "CCL Chemokines and asthma", IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (200005), vol. 21, no. 5, ISSN 0167-5699, pages 235 - 242, XP004198153 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-5699(00)01634-0 | Examination | - MOSIER-DE ET AL., "Highly potent RANTES analogues either prevent CCR5-using human immunodeficiency virus type 1 infection in vivo or rapidly select for CXCR4-using variants", JOURNAL OR VIROLOGY, (199905), page 3544-3550 |