EP1506034 - HELMET FOR ARTIFICIAL RESPIRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dimar S.R.L. Viale Gramsci, 239/B 41037 Mirandola (MO) / IT | [2010/11] |
Former [2005/07] | For all designated states Dimar S.R.L. Via Pollastri, 28 41037 Mirandola / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORSARI, Maurizio Via Cavalieri di Vittorio Veneto, 1 I-41037 Mirandola-Modena / IT | [2005/07] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/07] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03730052.2 | 14.05.2003 | [2005/07] | WO2003EP05135 | Priority number, date | IT2002MI01036 | 15.05.2002 Original published format: IT MI20021036 | IT2002MI00460U | 08.10.2002 Original published format: IT MI20020460 U | [2005/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03097145 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1506034 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1506034 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/06 | [2005/07] | CPC: |
A61M16/06 (EP,US);
A61M16/0627 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HELM FÜR DIE KÜNSTLICHE BEATMUNG | [2005/07] | English: | HELMET FOR ARTIFICIAL RESPIRATION | [2005/07] | French: | CASQUE DE RESPIRATION ARTIFICIELLE | [2005/07] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/07] | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.03.2010 | CY | 31.03.2010 | CZ | 31.03.2010 | DK | 31.03.2010 | EE | 31.03.2010 | FI | 31.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | NL | 31.03.2010 | RO | 31.03.2010 | SE | 31.03.2010 | SI | 31.03.2010 | SK | 31.03.2010 | TR | 31.03.2010 | IE | 14.05.2010 | LU | 14.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | BG | 30.06.2010 | PT | 02.08.2010 | HU | 01.10.2010 | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/42] | BE | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 14.05.2010 | ||
LU | 14.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 31.03.2010 | |
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 14.05.2010 | ||
LU | 14.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | BE | 31.03.2010 | |
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 14.05.2010 | ||
LU | 14.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 31.03.2010 | |
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 14.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 31.03.2010 | |
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 14.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | BE | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 14.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | BE | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | BE | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | BE | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | BE | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | BE | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | FI | 31.03.2010 | |
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | FI | 31.03.2010 | |
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | SI | 31.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2742900 (GIORGIO DOUGLAS J, et al) [Y] 8,9 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 10 * * figure 3; claims 1,3,6 *; | [Y]US4620538 (KOEGEL EWALD [US], et al) [Y] 2-7 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 2 * * figure 1; claims 1,3 *; | [Y]US5676133 (HICKLE RANDALL S [US], et al) [Y] 12,13 * column 5, line 28 - line 32 ** column 10, line 53 - line 60; figure 4 *; | [XY]US5819728 (RITCHIE SCOTT C [US]) [X] 1,10,11 * column 2, line 26 - line 58 * * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 52 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-9,12,13 |