EP1488021 - METHOD FOR THE THERMAL TREATMENT OF A FOUNDRY PIECE MADE FROM AN ALLOY BASED ON ALUMINIUM AND FOUNDRY PIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/52] | METHOD FOR THE THERMAL TREATMENT OF FOUNDRY PIECES MADE FROM AN ALLOY BASED ON ALUMINIUM AND FOUNDRY PIECES WITH IMPROVED MECHANICAL PROPERTIES | ||
[2013/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONTUPET S.A. 202 Quai de Clichy F-92110 Clichy / FR | [2004/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER, Philippe 278, route de Froissy F-60600 Ronquerolles / FR | 02 /
MASSINON, Denis 5 bis, rue Bunelle F-60140 Liancourt / FR | 03 /
JACQUET, Virginie 16 passage Dubail F-75010 Paris / FR | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2004/52] | Le Forestier, Eric, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03730296.5 | 20.03.2003 | [2004/52] | WO2003FR00887 | Priority number, date | FR20020003530 | 20.03.2002 Original published format: FR 0203530 | [2004/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03078674 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1488021 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1488021 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C22F1/043, C22F1/047 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
C22F1/043 (EP,US);
C22F1/047 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/52] | C22F1/043 | Designated contracting states | DE [2014/03] |
Former [2004/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR WÄRMEBEHANDLUNG EINES GUSSSTÜCKS AUS ALUMINIUM-LEGIERUNG, UND GUSSSTÜCK | [2013/33] | English: | METHOD FOR THE THERMAL TREATMENT OF A FOUNDRY PIECE MADE FROM AN ALLOY BASED ON ALUMINIUM AND FOUNDRY PIECE | [2013/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE D'UNE PIÈCE DE FONDERIE EN ALLIAGE A BASE D'ALUMINIUM ET PIÈCE DE FONDERIE | [2013/33] |
Former [2004/52] | VERFAHREN ZUR WÄRMEBEHANDLUNG VON GUSSSTÜCKEN AUS ALUMINIUM-LEGIERUNG | ||
Former [2004/52] | METHOD FOR THE THERMAL TREATMENT OF FOUNDRY PIECES MADE FROM AN ALLOY BASED ON ALUMINIUM AND FOUNDRY PIECES WITH IMPROVED MECHANICAL PROPERTIES | ||
Former [2004/52] | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE DE PIECES DE FONDERIE EN ALLIAGE A BASE D'ALUMINIUM | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 26.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1065292 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [X] 1-9 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]WO0116387 (ASAHI TEC CORP [JP], et al) |