EP1576382 - SELF-SHIELDED GRADIENT COIL ARRANGEMENTS WITH MINIMISED RISK OF PARTIAL DISCHARGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tesla Engineering Limited Water Lane Storrington West Sussex RH20 3EA / GB | [2005/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLDIE, Frederick Thomas David 18 Northfield Road Worthing, West Sussex BN13 1QW / GB | 02 /
BEGG, Michael Colin 104 Rectory Road Worthingeet, West Sussex BN14 7PN / GB | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [2013/16] |
Former [2012/18] | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/38] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al fJ CLEVELAND 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03730352.6 | 09.06.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003GB02448 | Priority number, date | GB20020013131 | 07.06.2002 Original published format: GB 0213131 | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03104831 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1576382 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1576382 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/385 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
G01R33/385 (EP,US);
G01R33/4215 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Title | German: | SELBSTABGESCHIRMTE GRADIENTENSPULENANORDNUNGEN MIT MINIMIERTEM RISIKO VON TEILENTLADUNGEN | [2005/38] | English: | SELF-SHIELDED GRADIENT COIL ARRANGEMENTS WITH MINIMISED RISK OF PARTIAL DISCHARGE | [2005/38] | French: | ASSEMBLAGES DE BOBINES DE GRADIENT AUTO-BLINDEES AVEC MINIMISATION DU RISQUE D'UNE DECHARGE PARTIELLE | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 01.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.06.2003 | AT | 17.04.2013 | BE | 17.04.2013 | CY | 17.04.2013 | CZ | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | EE | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | RO | 17.04.2013 | SE | 17.04.2013 | SI | 17.04.2013 | SK | 17.04.2013 | TR | 17.04.2013 | IE | 09.06.2013 | LU | 09.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.07.2013 | PT | 19.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
TR | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 19.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]EP0317775 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-3,16 * the whole document * [A] 8-13 [Y] 4-7,15; | [A]US5406205 (MUELLER WOLFGANG H [DE]) [A] 1-13,15 * column 10, line 54 - column 11, line 5 *; | [A]US6144204 (SEMENTCHENKO MIKHAIL G [RU]) [A] 1,14* column 6, line 1 - line 11; figure 8 *; | [Y]US6311389 (UOSAKI YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 4-7,15 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 19 * |