EP1458853 - METHODS OF DONOR SPECIFIC CROSSMATCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Absorber AB Drottninggatan 33, Box 7710 103 95 Stockholm / SE | [2009/48] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Absorber AB Drottninggatan 33, Box 7710 103 95 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUMITRAN-HOLGERSSON, Suchitra Venusvagen 6A S-141 33 Huddinge / SE | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9, Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03730427.6 | 16.05.2003 | [2004/39] | WO2003IB02502 | Priority number, date | US20020381033P | 16.05.2002 Original published format: US 381033 P | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03098212 | Date: | 27.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1458853 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1458853 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/06, G01N33/53, G01N33/569, G01N33/564 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
G01N33/56966 (EP,US);
G01N2333/475 (EP,US);
G01N2333/71 (EP,US);
G01N2800/24 (EP,US);
G01N2800/245 (EP,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DONORSPEZIFISCHES CROSSMATCHING | [2004/39] | English: | METHODS OF DONOR SPECIFIC CROSSMATCHING | [2004/39] | French: | METHODES D'ESSAI DE COMPATIBILITE CROISEE SPECIFIQUE DU DONNEUR | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 02.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO03014326 (IMCLONE SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-5,7-12 * claim 13 *; | [XY] - F. GEORGE ET AL, "Rapid isolation of human endothelial cells from whole blood using s-endo1 monoclonal antibody coupled to immuno-magnetic beads: demonstration of endothelial injury after angioplasty", THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, (1992), vol. 67, no. 1, pages 147 - 153, XP002263441 [X] 1,4,5,7-12,25-28 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,6,13-24 | [XY] - ROSELLA SBARBATI ET AL, "Immunologic detection of endothelial cells in human whole blood", BLOOD, (19910215), vol. 77, no. 4, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 764 - 769, XP002263442 [X] 1,4,5,7-12,25-28 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,6,13-24 | [XY] - M.K. JONES ET AL, "Isolation and characterization of rat gastric microvascular endothelial cells as a model for studying gastric angiogenesis in vitro", JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY AND PHARMACOLOGY, (2000), vol. 51, no. 4, pages 813 - 820, XP002263443 [X] 1,4-12,25-28 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,6,13-24 | [XY] - MARIO PEICHEV ET AL, "Expression of VEGFR-2 and AC133 by circulating human CD34+ cells identifies a population of functional endothelial precursors", BLOOD, (20000201), vol. 95, no. 3, pages 952 - 958, XP002263444 [X] 1,4,5,7-12,25-28 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,6,13-24 | [XY] - TAKASHI MATSUBARA ET AL, "Isolation and culture of rat retinal microvessel endothelial cells using magnetic beads coated with antibodies to PECAM-1", CURRENT EYE RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 20, no. 1, ISSN 0271-3683, pages 1 - 7, XP002263445 [X] 1,4,5,7-12,25-28 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,6,13-24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1076/0271-3683(200001)20:1;1-H;FT001 | [XY] - BELINDA L. DRAKE ET AL, "Isolation of endothelial cells from human first trimester decidua using immunomagnetic beads", HUMAN REPRODUCTION, (1991), vol. 6, no. 8, pages 1156 - 1159, XP002263446 [X] 1,4,5,7-12,25-28 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,6,13-24 | [XY] - R. JOPLIN ET AL, "Immuno-isolation and culture of biliary epithelial cells from normal human liver", IN VITRO CELL. DEV. BIOL., (198912), vol. 25, ISSN 0883-8364, pages 1189 - 1192, XP002263447 [X] 1,4,5,7-12,25-28 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,6,13-24 | [XY] - C.J. JACKSON ET AL, "Binding of human endothelium to ulex europaeus I-coated dynabeads: application to the isolation of microvascular endothelium", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 96, pages 257 - 262, XP002263448 [X] 1,4,5,7-12,25-28 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,6,13-24 | [Y] - ADRIAN S. WOOLF ET AL, "Angiopoietin growth factors and tie receptor tyrosine kinases in renal vascular development", PEDIATR NEPHROL, (2001), vol. 16, pages 177 - 184, XP002263449 [Y] 2,3,6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004670000509 | [Y] - C PERREY ET AL, "An association between antibodies specific for endothelial cells and renal transplant failure", TRANSPLANT IMMUNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 6, ISSN 0966-3274, pages 101 - 106, XP002263450 [Y] 13-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0966-3274(98)80024-5 | [PX] - DILKI VERMEHREN ET AL, "Isolation of precursos endothelial cells from peripheral blood for donor-specific crossmatching before organ transplantation", TRANSPLANTATION, (20021215), vol. 72, no. 11, ISSN 0041-1337, pages 1479 - 1486, XP002263451 [PX] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00007890-200212150-00001 | [X] - ALEXANDRA DIMITRIU-BONA ET AL, "Cytotoxicity to endothelial cells by sera from aged MRL/Ipr/Ipr mice is associated with autoimmunity to cells surface heparan sulfate", CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY AND IMMUNOPATHOLOGY, (199509), vol. 76, no. 3, ISSN 0090-1229, pages 234 - 240, XP002272823 [X] 25-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/clin.1995.1121 | [X] - LAUREN BRASILE, B.S. ET AL, "Identifiction of an autoantibody to vascular endothelial cell-specific antigens in patients with systemic vasculitis", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (198907), vol. 87, pages 74 - 80, XP002272824 [X] 25-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0002-9343(89)80486-3 | [X] - J. CERILI ET AL, "The role of autoantibody to vascular endothelial cell antigens in atherosclerosis and vascular disease", TRANSPLANTATION PROCEEDINGS, (198708), vol. XIX, no. 4, pages 47 - 49, XP002272825 [X] 25-28 * the whole document * | [X] - ANDREW ALBERT BORG, "Antibodies to cytokeratins in inflammatory arthropaties", SEMINARS IN ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM, (199712), vol. 27, no. 3, ISSN 0049-0172, pages 186 - 195, XP002272826 [X] 25-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0049-0172(97)80019-4 | by applicant | US4654267 | - F. GEORGE ET AL., THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, (1992), vol. 67, no. 1, pages 147 - 153 | - ROSELLA SBARBATI ET AL., BLOOD, (19910215), vol. 77, no. 4, pages 764 - 769 | - M.K. JONES ET AL., JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY AND PHARMACOLOGY, (2000), vol. 51, no. 4, pages 813 - 820 | - MARIO PEICHEV ET AL., BLOOD, (20000201), vol. 95, no. 3, pages 952 - 958 |