EP1512725 - DISPERSION AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF MOLDINGS BY USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daicel Chemical Industries, Ltd. Mainichi Intecio 3-4-5, Umeda Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2008/01] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states Daicel Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1 Teppo-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Hisayoshi 500-324, Kamiyobe, Yobe-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1262 / JP | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/10] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03730505.9 | 16.05.2003 | [2005/10] | WO2003JP06171 | Priority number, date | JP20020156112 | 29.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002156112 | JP20030023536 | 31.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003023536 | [2005/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03099933 | Date: | 04.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1512725 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1512725 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1512725 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/00, C08L5/00, C08J9/26 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
C08J9/26 (EP,KR,US);
C08L101/00 (KR);
C08L5/00 (KR);
C08J2201/0422 (EP,US);
C08K5/0016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2005/38] |
Former [2005/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DISPERSION UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FORMKÖRPERN UNTER DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2005/10] | English: | DISPERSION AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF MOLDINGS BY USING THE SAME | [2005/10] | French: | DISPERSION ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE MOULAGES UTILISANT UNE DISPERSION | [2005/10] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2004 | Translation filed | 19.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 14.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11009158.4 / EP2431411 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPS5859223 [ ]; | [X]JPS5859233 (GOODRICH CO B F) [X] 1 * whole document *; | [X]US5290832 (SCHWERZEL THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1 * claim 1 * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1983-47795k, & JPS5859223 A 19830408 (GOODRICH CO B F) [ ] * column A * | International search | [XE]JP2003192823 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [XP]JP2003020356 (FOUND ADVANCEMENT SCI & TECH); | [X]WO0142367 (JP NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SC [JP], et al); | [X]JPH0948876 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [X]JPH09324117 (KINUGAWA RUBBER IND) | Examination | JPS59189169 | US5159049 | JPH1192586 | EP1247840 | - OXLEY H.R., "Macroporous hydrogels for biomedical applications: methodology and morphology", BIOMATERIALS, (19931130), vol. 14, no. 14, pages 1064 - 1072 | by applicant | US5290832 | WO0142367 | US5159049 | - OXLEY H. R., "Macroporous Hydrogels for Biomedical Applications: methodology and morphology", BIOMATERIALS, (19931130), vol. 14, no. 14, doi:doi:10.1016/0142-9612(93)90207-I, pages 1064 - 1072, XP024141470 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0142-9612(93)90207-I |