EP1519380 - INTERLEAVED DATA ERROR CORRECTION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUDA, Syuji 5-15 A-406, Niina Minoh-shi, Osaka 562-0005 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Takashi 19-21-612, Ikedahonmachi Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0030 / JP | [2006/23] |
Former [2005/13] | 01 /
MATSUDA, Syuji 7-1-337, Miyano-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-0081 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAMURA, Takashi 19-21-612, Ikedahonmachi Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0030 / JP | Representative(s) | Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | Holmes, Miles, et al Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets, Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 03730750.1 | 02.06.2003 | [2005/13] | WO2003JP06909 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004109694 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1519380 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/18, G11B20/12, H03M13/27, H03M13/29 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
G11B20/18 (EP,US);
G11B20/1803 (EP,US);
G11B20/1833 (EP,US);
G11B20/1866 (EP,US);
H03M13/27 (EP,US);
H03M13/2954 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1836 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/13] | G11B20/18, G11B20/12, H03M13/27 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/13] | Title | German: | FEHLERKORREKTURVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR VERSCHACHTELTE DATEN | [2005/13] | English: | INTERLEAVED DATA ERROR CORRECTION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2005/13] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CORRECTION D'ERREURS DE DONNEES ENTRELACEES | [2005/13] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2004 | Translation filed | 21.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2004 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 11.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/01] | 22.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/01] | Divisional application(s) | EP08155906.4 / EP1953754 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9960706 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document ** figures 3,4 *; | [A]US6378100 (VAN DIJK MARTEN E [NL], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 6-9 *; | [A]US2002157055 (COENE WILLEM MARIE JULIA MARCE [NL], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 2 *; | [A] - NARAHARA T ET AL, "OPTICAL DISC SYSTEM FOR DIGITAL VIDEO RECORDING", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PUBLICATION OFFICE JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. TOKYO, JP, (19990711), vol. 39, no. 2B, PART 1, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 912 - 919, XP001005912 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.39.912 | [A] - COENE W ET AL, "Channel coding and signal processing for optical recording systems beyond DVD", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (20000814), vol. 37, no. 2, pt1, ISSN 0018-9464, pages 682 - 688, XP002204220 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.917601 | [A] - TEHRANCHI B ET AL, "RELIABILITY ESTIMATES FOR DATA RECOVERY FROM COMPACT DISCS", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA,WASHINGTON, US, (19980110), vol. 37, no. 2, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 386 - 395, XP000955394 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * * tables 3-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.37.000386 | [A] - YAMAMOTO K ET AL, "ERROR MODELING AND PERFORMANCE ANALYSIS OF ERROR-CORRECTING CODES FOR THE DIGITAL VIDEO RECORDING SYSTEM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (199907), vol. 3864, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 339 - 341, XP008010988 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * * figure 2 * | International search | [A]JP2002367296 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al); | [A]JPH07123013 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN); | [A]JPH10190486 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP], et al) |