EP1510354 - RECORDING MEDIUM HAVING INK RECEPTIVE LAYER AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2014/11] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONDO, Yuji, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
IIDA, Shigehira, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
SANTO, Tsuyoshi, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 04 /
SATO, Motoaki, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 05 /
YAMAGUCHI, Kenichi, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2014/11] |
Former [2005/09] | 01 /
KONDO, Yuji, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | ||
02 /
IIDA, Shigehira, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | |||
03 /
SANTO, Tsuyoshi, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | |||
04 /
SATO, Motoaki, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | |||
05 /
YAMAGUCHI, Kenichi, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2014/11] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/09] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03730786.5 | 03.06.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003JP07001 | Priority number, date | JP20020162911 | 04.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002162911 | [2005/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03101746 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510354 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1510354 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/52, B41M5/50 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M5/508 (EP,US);
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B41M5/5254 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/09] | B41M5/00, B41J2/01, D21H19/60, D21H19/82 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM MIT TINTENAUFNAHMESCHICHT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAFÜR | [2005/09] | English: | RECORDING MEDIUM HAVING INK RECEPTIVE LAYER AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2005/09] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT DOTE D'UNE COUCHE AMOUREUSE D'ENCRE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIE | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2004 | Translation filed | 16.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 25.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.06.2003 | AT | 12.03.2014 | BE | 12.03.2014 | CY | 12.03.2014 | CZ | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | ES | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | IT | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | NL | 12.03.2014 | RO | 12.03.2014 | SE | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | SK | 12.03.2014 | TR | 12.03.2014 | IE | 03.06.2014 | LU | 03.06.2014 | BG | 12.06.2014 | GB | 12.06.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | FR | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 03.06.2003 | |
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 03.06.2014 | ||
LU | 03.06.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 03.06.2014 | ||
LU | 03.06.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 03.06.2014 | ||
LU | 03.06.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 03.06.2014 | ||
LU | 03.06.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
FR | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 03.06.2014 | ||
LU | 03.06.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 03.06.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 03.06.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 03.06.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4877686 (RIOU CLAUDE R [FR], et al) [A] 7-14,16-21,25,26 * claim 1 * * column 4, line 40 - line 54 *; | [X]EP1002657 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,15,19,25,26 * claims 1,6 * * paragraph [0025] * * page 4, line 58 * * page 5, line 2 * * page 7, line 13 * * page 7, line 16 - line 18 *; | [A]EP1111452 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 7-14,16-21,25,26 * claim 1 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * page 4, line 3 ** example 5 *; | [XA]WO0234541 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,15,19-21 * claims 1,4 * * page 11, line 26 - line 27 * * page 12, line 12 * * page 12, line 14 - line 15 * * page 14, line 23 * * page 21, line 29 - page 22, line 19 * * example 10 * [A] 22-24; | [XA]US2002064633 (WAKATA YUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,15,19,25,26 * claims 3,4 * * sentence 5, paragraph 72 * * sentence 15, paragraph 99 * * paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0153] * * sentence 1, paragraph 160 - sentence 3 * * paragraph [0173] * * paragraph [0177] * * paragraph [0131] * * paragraph [0146] - paragraph [0147] * [A] 22-24 | International search | [XP]JP2003094800 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD); | [XP]JP2002321445 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD); | [XP]JP2002225423 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD); | [XE]JP2003165269 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD); | [XE]JP2003191633 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD); | [AP]EP1226959 (SCHOELLER FELIX JUN FOTO [DE]); | [A]JPH09314987 (SOMAR CORP); | [AE]EP1321300 (AGFA GEVAERT [BE]); | [A]JP2001334748 (OSAKA SEALING LABEL PRINT) | by applicant | US2002064633 | EP1002657 | WO0234541 |