EP1502286 - METHOD OF FABRICATING VERTICAL STRUCTURE LEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. LG Twin Towers, 20 Yeouido-dong, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. LG Twin Towers, 20 Yeouido-dong, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states Oriol, Inc. 3390 Visa Court Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jong-Lam Faculty Housing E-1401, Jigok-dong 756 Nam-gu, P'ohang 790-784 / KR | 02 /
JEONG, In-Kwon 10697 Rosewood Road Cupertino, CA 95014-6028 / US | 03 /
YOO, Myung, Cheol 6321 Camino Del Lago Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | [2005/30] |
Former [2005/05] | 01 /
LEE, Jong-Lam Faculty Housing E-1401, Jigok-dong 756 Nam-gu, P'ohang 790-784 / KR | ||
02 /
JEONG, In-Kwon 957 Greenwich Ave Sunnyvale, CA 94087-1134 / US | |||
03 /
YOO, Myung, Cheol 6321 Camino Del Lago Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Taor, Simon Edward William Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/05] | Marks & Clerk Incorporating Edward Evans Barker Clifford's Inn Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 03731009.1 | 31.03.2003 | [2005/05] | WO2003US09501 | Priority number, date | US20020118316 | 09.04.2002 Original published format: US 118316 | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03088318 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1502286 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1502286 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.01.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00, H01L33/00 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
H01C7/006 (EP,US);
H01L33/12 (US);
H01C7/008 (EP,US);
H01L27/0802 (EP,US);
H01L28/20 (EP,US);
H01L33/0025 (US);
H01L33/007 (US);
H01L33/0093 (EP,US);
H01L33/0095 (US);
H01L33/06 (US);
H01L33/32 (EP,US);
H01L33/36 (US);
H01L33/38 (EP,US);
H01L33/40 (US);
H01L33/44 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/05] | H01L21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERTIKALSTRUKTUR-LEDS | [2005/05] | English: | METHOD OF FABRICATING VERTICAL STRUCTURE LEDS | [2005/05] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE DEL A STRUCTURE VERTICALE | [2005/05] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 22.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07013949.8 / EP1848026 | EP10183473.7 / EP2261949 | EP10183495.0 / EP2261950 | EP10183510.6 / EP2261951 | EP14194349.8 / EP2860753 | EP14194354.8 / EP2860779 | EP14194356.3 / EP2863444 | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41] | Request for further processing for: | 11.07.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 10.07.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.07.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.10.2008 | BE | 29.10.2008 | CY | 29.10.2008 | CZ | 29.10.2008 | DK | 29.10.2008 | EE | 29.10.2008 | IT | 29.10.2008 | RO | 29.10.2008 | SI | 29.10.2008 | SK | 29.10.2008 | TR | 29.10.2008 | BG | 29.01.2009 | SE | 29.01.2009 | GR | 30.01.2009 | ES | 09.02.2009 | PT | 30.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | GB | 31.03.2009 | IE | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | LU | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | HU | 30.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
GB | 31.03.2009 | ||
IE | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
LU | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
HU | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
GB | 31.03.2009 | ||
IE | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
LU | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
GB | 31.03.2009 | ||
IE | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
GB | 31.03.2009 | ||
IE | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
IE | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
IE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 09.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10022879 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [X] 1,6-10,25 * figures 9,10,13 *; | [X]US6365429 (KNEISSL MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7 * figures 8,11 *; | [A] - SONG Y-K ET AL, "A vertical injection blue light emitting diode in substrate separated InGaN heterostructures", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19990614), vol. 74, no. 24, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 3720 - 3722, XP012022934 [A] 1,10,25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.123232 | International search | [Y]US6067309 (ONOMURA MASAAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US6281526 (NITTA KOICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US6303405 (YOSHIDA HIROAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US6326294 (JANG JA SOON [KR], et al) |