EP1512231 - COMPOUND PORTABLE COMPUTING DEVICE WITH DUAL PORTION KEYBOARD COUPLED OVER A WIRELESS LINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wireless 3G 3 Bird Court Alameda, CA 94501 / US | [2005/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHOO, Soon, Huat 3 Bird Court Alameda, CA 94501 / US | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Turner, James Arthur D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | Turner, James Arthur D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03731597.5 | 06.06.2003 | [2005/10] | WO2003US18012 | Priority number, date | US20020167251 | 10.06.2002 Original published format: US 167251 | [2005/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03105366 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1512231 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/00, H04M1/00 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
G06F3/0231 (EP,US);
G06F3/0233 (EP,US);
G06F3/0238 (EP,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENGESETZTE TRAGBARE DATENVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG MIT DOPPELTEILTASTATUR, DIE ÜBER EINE DRAHTLOSE STRECKE GEKOPPELT IST | [2005/10] | English: | COMPOUND PORTABLE COMPUTING DEVICE WITH DUAL PORTION KEYBOARD COUPLED OVER A WIRELESS LINK | [2005/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE PORTABLE COMPOSITE POSSEDANT UN CLAVIER EN DEUX PARTIES RELIEES PAR UNE CONNEXION SANS FIL | [2005/10] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 24.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/26] | 10.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9850849 (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 2 ** page 3, line 20 - page 9, line 7; figures 1-4b; claims 1-22 *; | [X]US6081207 (BATIO JEFFRY [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 2, line 14 - column 4, line 10 * * column 4, line 65 - column 10, line 5; figures 1-25; claims 1-4 *; | [X]US6111527 (SUSEL IRVING [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 3, line 12 - column 3, line 25; figures 1a-3c * * column 3, line 65 - column 9, line 13; claims 1-20 *; | [X]US6266234 (LEMAN MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 2, line 11 - column 2, line 55; figures 1-9 * * column 3, line 34 * | International search | [AE]US5410333 (CONWAY KEVIN M [US]); | [AE]US5924044 (VANNATTA LOUIS JAY [US], et al); | [AE]US5949643 (BATIO JEFFRY [US]); | [AE]US5983073 (DITZIK RICHARD J [US]); | [AE]US5999996 (DUNN MATTHEW W [US]); | [AE]US6266234 (LEMAN MICHAEL [US]); | [AP]US2003052164 (HIGGINSON TIMOTHY B [US]); | [AT]US2003139144 (KITAJIMA HIDETOSHI [JP], et al); | [AT]US2003153355 (WARREN PETER [US]); | [AT]US6628961 (HO MARTIN [TW], et al) |