EP1472447 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A GAS TURBINE GROUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ansaldo Energia IP UK Limited 5th Floor, North Side 7/10 Chandos Street Cavendish Square London W1G 9DQ / GB | [2017/21] |
Former [2016/33] | For all designated states General Electric Technology GmbH Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DÖBBELING, Klaus Spitzmattstrasse 201 CH-5210 Windisch / CH | 02 /
HAFFNER, Ken-Yves Ländliweg 21 CH-5400 Baden / CH | 03 /
RÜETSCHI, Rolf Feldstrasse 7 CH-5415 Nussbaumen / CH | 04 /
ZINN, Hanspeter Birchstrasse 17a CH-5406 Baden-Rütihof / CH | [2005/01] |
Former [2004/45] | 01 /
DÖBBELING, Klaus Spitzmattstrasse 201 CH-5210 Windisch / CH | ||
02 /
HAFFNER, Ken-Yves Ländliweg 21 CH-5400 Baden / CH | |||
03 /
RÜETSCHI, Rolf Hardackerstrasse 37 CH-5301 Siggenthal-Station / CH | |||
04 /
ZINN, Hanspeter Birchstrasse 17a CH-5406 Baden-Rütihof / CH | Representative(s) | Bernotti, Andrea, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2018/17] | Application number, filing date | 03731614.8 | 22.01.2003 | [2004/45] | WO2003CH00045 | Priority number, date | DE2002103102 | 25.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10203102 | CH20020000991 | 10.06.2002 Original published format: CH 9912002 | [2004/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03062618 | Date: | 31.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1472447 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1472447 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/48] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1472447 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02C9/40, F02C3/22, F23N5/00, G01N21/35, G01N33/00 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
G01N21/359 (EP,US);
F02C3/22 (EP,US);
F02C9/40 (EP,US);
F23N5/003 (EP,US);
G01N21/3504 (EP,US);
G01N33/225 (EP,US);
F23N2221/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2018/17] |
Former [2006/48] | DE, GB | ||
Former [2004/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER GASTURBOGRUPPE | [2004/45] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A GAS TURBINE GROUP | [2004/45] | French: | PROCEDE D'UTILISATION D'UN GROUPE DE TURBINES A GAZ | [2004/45] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 05.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.06.2007
14.06.2007
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/48] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.06.2007
14.06.2007
ADMISSIBLE SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.06.2007
14.06.2007
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Abt. CT IP PG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | 04.10.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.04.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.01.2013 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.01.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.10.2017 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 05.03.2018 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 18.03.2013 | Appeal received No. T0735/13 | 21.05.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.10.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent inadmissible | 11.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.10.2017 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0156200 (RUHRGAS AG [DE]); | [Y]US4594510 (BROWN CHRIS W [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * column W *; | [A]WO9106809 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0554095 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0014451 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [YD]US6082092 (VANDERVORT CHRISTIAN L [US]) [YD] 1-16 * column W *; | [Y]EP1022514 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-16 * column W *; | [A]WO0052315 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE19921981 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [X] 1,4,16 * the whole document * [Y] 1-16; | [Y]EP1070955 (ZELLWEGER ANALYTICS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0214661 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [PX] 1* claims 1,56 * | Opposition | JPS5338808 | JP2000266341 | DE19918901 | DE10022882 |