EP1553960 - NEUREGULIN BASED METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2016 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zensun (Shanghai) Science & Technology, Co., Ltd. No. 68 Ju Li Road Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Pudong Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2016/31] |
Former [2010/28] | For all designated states Zensun (Shanghai) Science and Technology Limited No.68 Ju Li Road Zhangjiang Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | ||
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Zensun (Shanghai) Sci-Tech, Ltd. No. 328 Bibo Road, Hi-Tech Park, Zhangjiang Shanghai 201203 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Mingdong No. 328 Bibo Road Hi-Tech Park Zhangjiang, Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2017/12] |
Former [2005/29] | 01 /
ZHOU, Mingdong No. 328 Bibo Road, Hi-Tech Park Zhangjiang, Shanghai 201203 / CN | Representative(s) | Weber, Martin, et al Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | [2017/12] |
Former [2009/08] | Weber, Martin, et al Jones Day Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/29] | Otten, Hajo, Dr.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte, Postfach 105462 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03732172.6 | 15.05.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003CN00355 | Priority number, date | WO2002CN00349 | 24.05.2002 Original published format: PCT/CN02/00349 | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03099300 | Date: | 04.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1553960 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1553960 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/18 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
A61K38/1883 (EP,US);
A61K31/122 (EP,US);
A61K31/185 (EP,US);
A61K31/355 (EP,US);
A61K31/375 (EP,US);
A61K31/43 (EP,US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/2013 (EP,US);
A61K38/212 (EP,US);
A61K38/556 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K14/4756 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/122, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/185, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/375, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/43, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/2013, A61K38/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2005/29] | A61K35/30, A61K38/00, A61K38/18, A61K38/46, A61K38/55, A61K48/00, C12N15/10, C07K14/475 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/12] |
Former [2005/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN AUF NEUREGULIN-BASIS UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KARDIOVASKULÄREN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2017/01] | English: | NEUREGULIN BASED METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES | [2005/29] | French: | PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS A BASE DE NEUREGULINE POUR TRAITER LES MALADIES CARDIO-VASCULAIRES | [2005/29] |
Former [2005/29] | VERFAHREN AUF NEUREGULIN-BASIS UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KARDIOVASKULûREN ERKRANKUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 22.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 26.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12194239.5 / EP2606901 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2003 | AT | 22.03.2017 | CY | 22.03.2017 | CZ | 22.03.2017 | DK | 22.03.2017 | EE | 22.03.2017 | FI | 22.03.2017 | MC | 22.03.2017 | NL | 22.03.2017 | RO | 22.03.2017 | SI | 22.03.2017 | SK | 22.03.2017 | TR | 22.03.2017 | IE | 15.05.2017 | LU | 15.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | BG | 22.06.2017 | GR | 23.06.2017 | PT | 24.07.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.05.2003 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.05.2003 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 15.05.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 15.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/02] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | FI | 22.03.2017 | |
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6136558 (BALLINGER MARCUS D [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 25, lines 6-8; sequence 3 * [Y] 10; | [XY]CN1276381 (QIU LIEQUN [CN]) [X] 1-9 * page 7, paragraph 5 * [Y] 10; | [Y] - CRONE STEVEN A ET AL, "ErbB2 is essential in the prevention of dilated cardiomyopathy", NATURE MEDICINE, (20020501), vol. 8, no. 5, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 459 - 465, XP002531515 [Y] 10 * page 463, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0502-459 | International search | [X]WO9918976 (CAMBRIDGE NEUROSCIENCE INC [US], et al); | [X]WO0037095 (VICTOR CHANG CARDIAC RESEARCH [AU], et al); | [X]WO0064400 (CAMBRIDGE NEUROSCIENCE INC [US], et al); | [X]WO0164877 (DECODE GENETICS EHF [IS], et al) |