EP1533584 - EGR COOLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hino Motors, Ltd. 1-1, Hino-dai 3-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8660 / JP | For all designated states Sankyo Radiator Co., Ltd. 3-28, Owadacho 6-chome Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-0045 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Hino Motors, Ltd. 1-1, Hino-dai 3-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-8660 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sankyo Radiator Co., Ltd. 3-28, Owadacho 6-chome Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Yoji, c/o Sankyo Radiator Co., Ltd. 108-8, Sayamagahara Iruma-shi, Saitama 358-0032 / JP | [2007/33] |
Former [2005/21] | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Yoji, c/o Sankyo Radiator Co., Ltd. 3-28, Owadacho 6-chome Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-0045 / JP | Representative(s) | Köhler, Walter, et al Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Merianstraße 26 90409 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Köhler, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Louis,&Pöhlau,&Lohrentz Patentanwälte P.O. Box 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03733025.5 | 22.05.2003 | [2005/21] | WO2003JP06400 | Priority number, date | JP20020181757 | 21.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002181757 | [2005/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004001314 | Date: | 31.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1533584 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F28D7/16, F02M25/07, F28F1/06, F28F1/40 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
F28F1/06 (EP,US);
F28D7/16 (EP,KR,US);
F02M26/32 (EP,US);
F02M26/50 (EP,US);
F28F1/42 (EP,US);
F28F1/426 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/21] | F28D7/16, F02M25/07 | Designated contracting states | DE [2005/41] |
Former [2005/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AGF-KÜHLER | [2005/21] | English: | EGR COOLER | [2005/21] | French: | SYSTEME DE REFROIDISSEMENT POUR LE RECYCLAGE DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2005/21] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2004 | Translation filed | 22.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 05.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/45] | 22.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11108578 ; | [X]JP2001304047 ; | [A]JP2001254649 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11108578 A 19990423 (USUI INTERNATL IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020402), vol. 2002, no. 02, & JP2001304047 A 20011031 (USUI INTERNATL IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020701), vol. 2000, no. 26, & JP2001254649 A 20010921 (HINO MOTORS LTD; SANKYO RADIATOR KK) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5655599 (KASPRZYK MARTIN R [US]); | [Y]JP2001254649 (HINO MOTORS LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2001304047 (USUI INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRY) |