EP1561737 - SILICON CARBIDE MATRIX COMPOSITE MATERIAL, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PART OF SILICON CARBIDE MATRIX COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUYAMA, Shoko@Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
KAMEDA, Tsuneji@Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
ITOH, Yoshiyasu@Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2011/50] |
Former [2005/32] | 01 /
SUYAMA, Shoko Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
02 /
KAMEDA, Tsuneji Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | |||
03 /
ITOH, Yoshiyasu Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/32] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03733472.9 | 18.06.2003 | [2005/32] | WO2003JP07700 | Priority number, date | JP20020176680 | 18.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002176680 | JP20020190588 | 28.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002190588 | [2005/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004007401 | Date: | 22.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1561737 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1561737 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.01.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/56, C04B37/00 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B41J3/44 (KR);
C04B14/324 (US);
B41J2/01 (KR);
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
C04B35/573 (EP,US);
C04B37/005 (EP,US);
C04B37/006 (EP,US);
C04B37/008 (EP,US);
G03B19/02 (KR);
H04N23/00 (KR);
B32B2315/02 (EP,US);
C04B2235/383 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3834 (EP,US);
C04B2235/422 (EP,US);
C04B2235/428 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5454 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6027 (EP,US);
C04B2235/728 (EP,US);
C04B2235/762 (EP,US);
C04B2235/781 (EP,US);
C04B2235/785 (EP,US);
C04B2235/786 (EP,US);
C04B2235/80 (EP,US);
C04B2235/94 (EP,US);
C04B2235/96 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9615 (EP,US);
C04B2237/083 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/40] |
Former [2005/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SILICIUMCARBIDMATRIX-VERBUNDWERKSTOFF, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES TEILS AUS SILICIUMCARBIDMATRIX-VERBUNDWERKSTOFF | [2005/32] | English: | SILICON CARBIDE MATRIX COMPOSITE MATERIAL, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PART OF SILICON CARBIDE MATRIX COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2005/32] | French: | MATERIAU COMPOSITE A MATRICE EN CARBURE DE SILICIUM, SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE PIECE EN UN TEL MATERIAU | [2005/32] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2005 | Translation filed | 14.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 24.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10193638.3 / EP2336098 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH06199571 (NIPPON SERATETSUKU KK, et al); | [Y]JPH06293575 (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO); | [X]JPH0812436 (KYOCERA CORP); | [X]JPH08151268 (KYOCERA CORP); | [A]JPH08183661 (KYOCERA CORP); | [Y]JPH0920572 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [X]EP0798280 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [A]JP2001019551 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]WO0107377 (M 3 TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | [Y]JP2002037682 (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO) | by applicant | JPH06199571 | JPH0812436 | JPH08151268 | EP0798280 |