EP1534212 - SYSTEM FOR A DENTAL FILLING MATERIAL OR IMPLANT MATERIAL, AND POWDERED MATERIAL, HYDRATION LIQUID, IMPLANT MATERIAL AND METHOD OF ACHIEVING BONDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Doxa Aktiebolag Axel Johanssons Gata 4-6, Kristallen 754 51 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Doxa Aktiebolag Axel Johanssons Gata 4-6, Kristallen 754 51 Uppsala / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
KRAFT, Lars Ullsaxvägen 17 S-756 48 Uppsala / SE | 03 /
ENGQVIST, Hakan Margaretavägen 12 S-741 44 Knivsta / SE | 04 /
AHNFELT, Nils-Otto Nordhemsvägen 5A S-756 46 Uppsala / SE | 05 /
LÖÖF, Jesper Luthagsesplanaden 26B S-752 24 Uppsala / SE | 06 /
SCHULZ-WALZ, Jan-Erik Dorotheenstr. 14 S-22301 Hamburg / SE | [2006/46] |
Former [2006/18] | 01 /
* * * | ||
02 /
KRAFT, Lars Ullsaxvägen 17 S-756 48 Uppsala / SE | |||
03 /
ENGQVIST, Hakan Margaretavägen 12 S-741 44 Knivsta / SE | |||
04 /
AHNFELT, Nils-Otto Nordhemsvägen 5A S-756 46 Uppsala / SE | |||
05 /
LÖÖF, Jesper Luthagsesplanaden 26B S-752 24 Uppsala / SE | |||
06 /
SCHULZ-WALZ, Jan-Erik Dorotheenstr. 14 S-22301 Hamburg / SE | |||
Former [2005/22] | 01 /
HERMANSSON, Leif Stenbrohultsvägen 20, 3 tr S-757 58 Uppsala / SE | ||
02 /
KRAFT, Lars Ullsaxvägen 17 S-756 48 Uppsala / SE | |||
03 /
ENGQVIST, Hakan Margaretavägen 12 S-741 44 Knivsta / SE | |||
04 /
AHNFELT, Nils-Otto Nordhemsvägen 5A S-756 46 Uppsala / SE | |||
05 /
LÖÖF, Jesper Luthagsesplanaden 26B S-752 24 Uppsala / SE | |||
06 /
SCHULZ-WALZ, Jan-Erik Dorotheenstr. 14 S-22301 Hamburg / SE | Representative(s) | Svanfeldt, Hans-Ake, et al BRANN AB Västgötagatan 2 P.O. Box 17192 104 62 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | Svanfeldt, Hans-Ake, et al DR. LUDWIG BRANN PATENTBYRA AB P.O. Box 17192 104 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 03733717.7 | 11.06.2003 | [2005/22] | WO2003SE00954 | Priority number, date | SE20020001920 | 20.06.2002 Original published format: SE 0201920 | SE20020001921 | 20.06.2002 Original published format: SE 0201921 | SE20020002998 | 09.10.2002 Original published format: SE 0202998 | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004000239 | Date: | 31.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2004/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1534212 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 31.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/06, C04B28/06 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
C04B28/34 (EP,US);
A61K6/838 (EP,US);
A61K6/853 (EP,US);
A61K6/864 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00836 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/34, C04B14/366, C04B20/008, C04B22/0093, C04B22/062, C04B22/10, C04B24/14, C04B40/06, C04B2103/0094 (US,EP);
C04B28/34, C04B7/32, C04B14/06, C04B14/366, C04B20/008, C04B22/064, C04B22/10, C04B24/14, C04B40/06 (EP,US);
C04B28/34, C04B7/32, C04B14/303, C04B14/366, C04B20/008, C04B22/062, C04B22/10, C04B24/14, C04B40/06 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM FUR EIN ZAHNFULLMATERIAL ODER IMPLANTATIONSMATERIAL UND PULVERFORMIGES MATERIAL, HYDRATATIONSFLUSSIGKEIT, IMPLANTATIONSMATERIAL UND VERBINDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2005/22] | English: | SYSTEM FOR A DENTAL FILLING MATERIAL OR IMPLANT MATERIAL, AND POWDERED MATERIAL, HYDRATION LIQUID, IMPLANT MATERIAL AND METHOD OF ACHIEVING BONDING | [2005/22] | French: | SYSTEME DESTINE A UN MATERIAU D'OBTURATION DENTAIRE OU UN MATERIAU D'IMPLANT, ET MATERIAU EN POUDRE, LIQUIDE D'HYDRATATION, MATERIAU D'IMPLANT, ET PROCEDE DE LIAISON | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 16.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 02.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/06] | 18.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0021489 (DOXA CERTEX AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO0176534 (DOXA CERTEX AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO0176535 (DOXA CERTEX AB [SE], et al) | Examination | US3873327 | US4518430 | US5281265 | WO9402411 | DE4303575 | WO9926673 | WO9945979 | WO9948809 | WO02053068 |