EP1534415 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS MIXING OF COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Land & Sjö Food Technology AB Maskinvägen 5 227 30 Lund / SE | [2005/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSLUND, Jan-Olov Vadmöllan 181 S-225 94 Lund / SE | 02 /
STENSON, Per Viarp 4 S-272 91 Simrishamn / SE | 03 /
SJÖHOLM, Johan Mariedals Gard, Gottes väg 10 S-224 78 Lund / SE | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Akesson, Sten Jan-Ake, et al Awapatent AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Akesson, Sten Jan-Ake, et al Awapatent AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | ||
Former [2005/22] | Thylén, Eva Matilda AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 03733725.0 | 06.06.2003 | [2005/22] | WO2003SE00968 | Priority number, date | SE20020001816 | 12.06.2002 Original published format: SE 0201816 | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03106006 | Date: | 24.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1534415 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1534415 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/04, B01F3/08, B01F3/12, B01F7/00 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
B01F27/50 (EP);
B01F27/91 (EP);
B01F35/50 (EP);
B01F23/50 (EP);
B01F35/53 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM KONTINUIERLICHEN MISCHEN VON KOMPONENTEN | [2005/22] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS MIXING OF COMPONENTS | [2005/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR LE MELANGE CONTINU DE COMPOSANTS | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 13.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   07.12.2006 | 30.06.2009 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   03.12.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.01.2010 | BE | 20.01.2010 | CY | 20.01.2010 | CZ | 20.01.2010 | EE | 20.01.2010 | FI | 20.01.2010 | IT | 20.01.2010 | NL | 20.01.2010 | RO | 20.01.2010 | SE | 20.01.2010 | SI | 20.01.2010 | SK | 20.01.2010 | TR | 20.01.2010 | BG | 20.04.2010 | GR | 21.04.2010 | ES | 01.05.2010 | PT | 20.05.2010 | IE | 06.06.2010 | LU | 06.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | HU | 21.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
IE | 06.06.2010 | ||
LU | 06.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
HU | 21.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
IE | 06.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
HU | 21.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
IE | 06.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
IE | 06.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 20.01.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3580862 (WATSON LLOYD M, et al); | [A]US3669414 (LOVE GORDON D) |