EP1520439 - METHOD IN A MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATION NETWORK FOR OBTAINING LOCATION AND TIME INFORMATION ABOUT USERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SmartTrust AB Box 471 54 100 74 Stockholm / SE | [2005/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANNERSTRÖM, Sten Storgatan 17 S-171 63 Solna / SE | [2005/14] | Representative(s) | Söderman, Lisbeth Karin, et al Boco IP Oy Ab Itämerenkatu 5 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Söderman, Päivi Karin Lisbeth, et al BORENIUS & Co Oy Ab Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2005/14] | Söderman, Päivi Karin Lisbeth, et al Smarttrust Systems Oy P.O. Box 119 00511 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 03733750.8 | 16.06.2003 | [2005/14] | WO2003SE01014 | Priority number, date | SE20020002156 | 09.07.2002 Original published format: SE 0202156 | [2005/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004006601 | Date: | 15.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1520439 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1520439 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
H04N1/00106 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/14] | H04Q7/32, H04N1/00, H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/14] | Extension states | AL | 11.01.2005 | LT | 11.01.2005 | LV | 11.01.2005 | MK | 11.01.2005 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN IN EINEM MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ ZUM ERHALTEN VON POSITIONS- UND ZEITINFORMATIONEN ÜBER BENUTZER | [2005/14] | English: | METHOD IN A MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATION NETWORK FOR OBTAINING LOCATION AND TIME INFORMATION ABOUT USERS | [2005/14] | French: | PROCEDE APPLICABLE A UN RESEAU DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS MOBILES POUR L'OBTENTION D'INFORMATIONS D'EMPLACEMENT ET DE TEMPS CONCERNANT DES UTILISATEURS | [2005/14] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.02.2011 | BE | 23.02.2011 | CY | 23.02.2011 | CZ | 23.02.2011 | DK | 23.02.2011 | EE | 23.02.2011 | FI | 23.02.2011 | HU | 23.02.2011 | IT | 23.02.2011 | NL | 23.02.2011 | RO | 23.02.2011 | SE | 23.02.2011 | SI | 23.02.2011 | SK | 23.02.2011 | TR | 23.02.2011 | BG | 23.05.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | ES | 03.06.2011 | IE | 16.06.2011 | LU | 16.06.2011 | PT | 23.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
TR | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
IE | 16.06.2011 | ||
LU | 16.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
IE | 16.06.2011 | ||
LU | 16.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
IE | 16.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
IE | 16.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
IE | 16.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 23.02.2011 | |
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5923763 (WALKER JAY S [US], et al) [A] 1,11,12* abstract *; | [Y]EP0963100 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [Y] 1-7,9,10,13 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 24 *; | [A]WO0149054 (SONERA OYJ [FI], et al) [A] 7,8 * page 1, line 2 - page 2, line 20 *; | [Y]EP1128284 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1-7,9,10,13 * page 3, line 50 - line 57 * * page 7, line 49 - page 8, line 3; figure 9 * * abstract *; | [A]US2002083323 (CROMER DARYL CARVIS [US], et al) [A] 1,7,8 * column 13 - column 14 * * column 19 - column 20 *; | [PX]EP1304859 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [PX] 1-7,9,10,13 * figures 2,3 * * abstract * | by applicant | US5923763 | US6154727 | DE19940649 | WO0149056 | EP1128284 | US6307950 | EP1304859 |