EP1517744 - DEVICE FOR MIXING AND DELIVERING BONE CEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asept Medical AB Traktorvägen 17 226 60 Lund / SE | [2007/52] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states Asept Medical AB Glimmervägen 8 224 78 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREBIUS, Staffan Siriusgatan 12 S-224 57 Lund / SE | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | Karlsson, Leif Gunnar Börje, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Karlsson, Leif Gunnar Börje, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2006/46] | Karlsson, Leif Gunnar Börje, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2006/21] | von Friesendorff, Filip, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2005/13] | Petri, Stellan Valea AB Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 03733785.4 | 23.06.2003 | [2005/13] | WO2003SE01070 | Priority number, date | SE20020002018 | 28.06.2002 Original published format: SE 0202018 | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004002615 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1517744 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1517744 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01F13/00, A61F2/46 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
A61B17/8825 (EP,US);
B01F31/441 (EP,US);
B01F33/5011 (EP,US);
A61B2017/8838 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4685 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 17.12.2004 | LV | 17.12.2004 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM MISCHEN UND ZUFÜHREN VON KNOCHENZEMENT | [2005/13] | English: | DEVICE FOR MIXING AND DELIVERING BONE CEMENT | [2005/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR MELANGER ET DISTRIBUER DU CIMENT OSSEUX | [2005/13] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 17.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 19.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2007 | CH | 07.11.2007 | CY | 07.11.2007 | CZ | 07.11.2007 | DK | 07.11.2007 | EE | 07.11.2007 | FI | 07.11.2007 | LI | 07.11.2007 | RO | 07.11.2007 | SI | 07.11.2007 | SK | 07.11.2007 | TR | 07.11.2007 | BG | 07.02.2008 | GR | 08.02.2008 | PT | 07.04.2008 | HU | 08.05.2008 | LU | 23.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
HU | 08.05.2008 | ||
LU | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
LU | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
RO | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0183094 (MARINO JAMES F [US]) |