EP1551326 - ARRANGEMENT FOR USING OSTEOINDUCTIVE OR BIOACTIVE MATERIAL TO INDUCE BONE AND/OR INCREASE THE STABILITY OF IMPLANTS IN THE JAW BONE, AND AN IMPLANT INTENDED FOR THIS PURPOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2011 | Change - representative | published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nobel Biocare AB (publ) Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | [2005/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALL, Jan Rosendalsgatan 12 S-416 80 Göteborg / SE | [2006/18] |
Former [2005/28] | 01 /
HALL, Jan Stabbegatan 2A S-416 80 Göteborg / SE | Representative(s) | Davies, Dominic Jack, et al Nobel Biocare AB Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | Davies, Dominic Jack, et al Nobel Biocare AB Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Byström, Kurt Linus, et al Nobel Biocare AB Box 5190 402 26 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 03733804.3 | 26.06.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003SE01106 | Priority number, date | SE20020002315 | 25.07.2002 Original published format: SE 0202315 | [2005/28] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004010887 | Date: | 05.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1551326 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00, A61L27/54 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61C8/0009 (EP,US);
A61C8/0012 (EP,US);
A61L2300/414 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG VON OSTEOINDUKTIVEM ODER BIOAKTIVEM MATERIAL ZUR EINLEITUNG VON KNOCHENWACHSTUM UND/ODER ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER STABILITÄT VON IMPLANTATEN IN KIEFERKNOCHEN, SOWIE FÜR DIESEN ZWECK BESTIMMTES IMPLANTAT. | [2005/28] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR USING OSTEOINDUCTIVE OR BIOACTIVE MATERIAL TO INDUCE BONE AND/OR INCREASE THE STABILITY OF IMPLANTS IN THE JAW BONE, AND AN IMPLANT INTENDED FOR THIS PURPOSE | [2005/28] | French: | MOYEN D'UTILISATION D'UNE MATIERE OSTEOINDUCTIVE OU BIOACTIVE POUR INDUIRE LA CROISSANCE OSSEUSE ET/OU POUR AMELIORER LA STABILITE DES IMPLANTS DANS L'OS DE LA MACHOIRE, IMPLANT UTILISE A CET EFFET | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2003 | Translation filed | 25.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 04.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/36] | 20.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0072775 (NOBEL BIOCARE AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO0072776 (NOBEL BIOCARE AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO0072777 (NOBEL BIOCARE AB [SE], et al) |