EP1499367 - MULTIFACETED ENDOVASCULAR STENT COATING FOR PREVENTING RESTENOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poly-Med, Inc. 6309 Highway 187 Anderson, SC 29625 / US | [2005/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHALABY, Shalaby, W. 6309 Highway 187 Anderson, SC 29625 / US | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Wüstefeld, Regine Marie Patentanwältin Hintere Grabenstrasse 26 72070 Tübingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | Wüstefeld, Regine Marie Dr. Patentanwältin Schütte 8/1 72108 Rottenburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/04] | Benson, John Everett J. A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 03733891.0 | 23.04.2003 | [2005/04] | WO2003US12831 | Priority number, date | US20020375182P | 24.04.2002 Original published format: US 375182 P | [2005/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03090807 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1499367 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/10, A61L31/16 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61L2300/41 (EP,US);
A61L2300/416 (EP,US);
A61L2300/42 (EP,US);
A61L2300/45 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L31/10, C08L101/02 (US,EP);
A61L31/10, C08L67/04 (EP,US);
A61L31/10, C08L71/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE [2005/18] |
Former [2005/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIELSEITIGE BESCHICHTUNG FÜR ENDOVASKULÄRE GEFÄSSSTÜTZEN ZUR RESTENOSEPROPHYLAXE | [2005/04] | English: | MULTIFACETED ENDOVASCULAR STENT COATING FOR PREVENTING RESTENOSIS | [2005/04] | French: | REVETEMENT DE PROTHESE ENDOVASCULAIRE MULTIFACETTE POUR LA PREVENTION DE LA RESTENOSE | [2005/04] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 26.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/52] | 10.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5073381 (IVAN BELA [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 1, lines 12-30,49-56 * * column 8, lines 24,26,31 * * column 9, lines 29-39 *; | [X]EP0737703 (POLY MED INC [US]) [X] 1,4-16 * example 1; claims 1,3,10,16,28,29 *; | [XY]WO9921908 (ANGIOTECH PHARM INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,4-18 * page 8, lines 20-26 * * page 13, lines 22-28 * * page 15, lines 15,16 * * page 21, lines 11-19 * * page 22, lines 3-16 * * page 27, lines 17-25 * * page 28, lines 22-27 * * page 30, lines 20,21 * * example 1 * * page 46, line 30 * * claims 1,9,11 * [Y] 1-18; | [Y]EP0952171 (POLY MED INC [US]) [Y] 1-18 * page 2, line 10 * * page 5, lines 43-47 * * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 29 * * page 9, lines 52,53,55 * * page 13, line 4 *; | [A]US5993972 (REICH MURRAY H [US], et al) [A] 1,4-18 * column 3, lines 15-42 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 16 * * column 7, lines 59-67 * * example 1 *; | [A]WO0101890 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,4-18 * claim - *; | [A]US6210717 (CHOI YOUNG KWEON [KR], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-4,21,42-45 *; | [A]US2001032014 (YANG DACHUAN [US], et al) [A] 1,4-18 * page 1, paragraphs 1,6,9,10 * * column 2, paragraphs 20,21,23 * * column 3, paragraphs 25-27,31 *; | [AP]WO02055122 (BIOCOMPATIBLES LTD [GB], et al) [AP] 1,4-18 * page 6, lines 10-19 * * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 12 * * claim 1 *; | [AP]US2002164365 (SHALABY SHALABY W [US], et al) [AP] 1* the whole document *; | [A] - JARR EM ET AL, "Sustained release of lidocaine from an injectable implant system for treatment of post-operative pain", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CONTROLLED RELEASE BIOACTIVE MATERIALS, XX, XX, (199907), vol. 26, ISSN 1022-0178, pages 631 - 632, XP002133945 [A] 1 * example . * |