EP1552443 - COMPUTERIZED METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GENERATING REPORTS AND DIAGNOSTICS WHICH MEASURE EFFECTIVENESS OF AN EVENT OR PRODUCT OR SERVICE PROMOTED AT THE EVENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Griffin, Grant 5018 Cherry Blossom Circle West Bloomfield, MI 48324 / US | [2005/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIFFIN, Grant 1819 West Melton Birmingham, MI 48009 / US | 02 /
LANCE, Jeremy, K. 317 Poplar Street Wyandotte, MI 48192 / US | [2006/25] |
Former [2005/28] | 01 /
GRIFFIN, Grant 5018 Cherry Blossom Circle West Bloomfield, MI 48324 / US | ||
02 /
LANCE, Jeremy, K. 317 Poplar Street Wyandotte, MI 48192 / US | Representative(s) | Duxbury, Stephen Arnold & Siedsma Bavariaring 17 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Duxbury, Stephen Arnold & Siedsma Isartorplatz 5 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03734181.5 | 23.05.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003US16516 | Priority number, date | US20020170305 | 13.06.2002 Original published format: US 170305 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03107114 | Date: | 24.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1552443 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0203 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0242 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0267 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0269 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COMPUTERISIERTES VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON BERICHTEN UND DIAGNOSE, WODURCH DIE EFFEKTIVITÄT EINES AM EREIGNIS GEFÖRDERTEN EREIGNISSES ODER PRODUKTS ODER DIENSTES GEMESSEN WIRD | [2005/28] | English: | COMPUTERIZED METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GENERATING REPORTS AND DIAGNOSTICS WHICH MEASURE EFFECTIVENESS OF AN EVENT OR PRODUCT OR SERVICE PROMOTED AT THE EVENT | [2005/28] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME INFORMATIQUE DE GENERATION DE RAPPORTS ET DE DIAGNOSTICS QUI MESURENT L'EFFICACITE D'UN EVENEMENT OU D'UN PRODUIT OU D'UN SERVICE MIS EN AVANT LORS DE CET EVENEMENT | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 05.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/11] | 12.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [X]US2002049628 (WEST WILLIAM T [US], et al); | [Y]US5237157 (KAPLAN JOSHUA D [US]); | [YE]US6574614 (KESEL BRAD [US]); | [Y]US6233564 (SCHULZE JR EVERETT E [US]) |