EP1511523 - IMPLANTABLE DEVICE WITH POROUS MEMBRANE RENDERED HYDROPHILIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gore Enterprise Holdings, Inc. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark, DE 19714-9206 / US | [2011/11] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states Gore Enterprise Holdings, Inc. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark, DE 19714-9206 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOK, Alonzo, D. 3917 S. Holland Road Flagstaff, AZ 86001 / US | 02 /
CUTRIGHT, Warren, J. 3075 S. Surrey Flagstaff, AZ 86001 / US | 03 /
KRALL, Robert, S. 8400 Pine Country Lane Flagstaff, AZ 86004 / US | 04 /
MONTGOMERY, William, D. 3473 W. Lois Lane Flagstaff, AZ 86001 / US | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Shanks, Andrew Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | Shanks, Andrew Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03734247.4 | 23.05.2003 | [2005/10] | WO2003US16865 | Priority number, date | US20020159836 | 31.05.2002 Original published format: US 159836 | [2005/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03101505 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1511523 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1511523 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/06 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61F2/82 (US);
A61B17/0057 (US);
A61B6/12 (US);
A61B8/0833 (US);
A61F2/01 (EP,US);
A61L31/048 (US);
A61L31/146 (US);
A61L31/18 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0097 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/27] |
Former [2005/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARE VORRICHTUNG MIT HYDROPHILISIERTER PORÖSER MEMBRAN | [2005/10] | English: | IMPLANTABLE DEVICE WITH POROUS MEMBRANE RENDERED HYDROPHILIC | [2005/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF IMPLANTABLE AVEC MEMBRANE POREUSE RENDUE HYDROPHILE | [2005/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 17.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4113912 (OKITA KOICHI) [Y] 1-23 * claims 1,5,21 ** example 4 *; | [XD]US4193138 (OKITA KOICHI [JP]) [XD] 16 * claims 1,2,5 * * examples 1,5 *; | [Y]US4917793 (PITT ALDO M [US], et al) [Y] 1-23 * column 1, lines 9-15 * * column 3, lines 18-23 *; | [YD]WO9640305 (GORE & ASS [US]) [YD] 1-23 * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 7 * * page 4, lines 25-31 *; | [XDY]US5902745 (BUTLER MARK D [US], et al) [XD] 16 * column 10, lines 35-50 * * column 11, lines 6-15,58-62 * * examples 3,4,7 * * column 11, lines 6-15 * * column 12, lines 27-33 * [Y] 1-23 |