EP1543455 - MULTI-PURPOSE KIOSK AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Western Union Company 12500 East Belford Avenue Englewood, CO 80112 / US | [2008/41] |
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states First Data Corporation 6200 South Quebec Street Greenwood Village, CO 80111 / US | ||
For all designated states The Western Union Company 12500 East Belford Avenue Englewood, CO 80112 / US | |||
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states First Data Corporation 12500 East Belford Avenue Englewood, CO 80112-5939 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLAIR, Paul, A. 11141 Tamarron Drive Parker, CO 80138 / US | 02 /
ALGIENE, Kenneth 9347 W. Vandeventor Drive Littleton, CO 80128 / US | 03 /
THOMPSON, Mark 5724 East 10th Avenue Denver, CO 80220 / US | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Henseler, Daniela, et al Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Henseler, Daniela, et al Sparing, Röhl, Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2005/25] | Henseler, Daniela, Dr. Sparing, Röhl, Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03734572.5 | 11.06.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003US18614 | Priority number, date | US20020225410 | 20.08.2002 Original published format: US 225410 | [2005/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004019155 | Date: | 04.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1543455 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, G07F19/00 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
G07F19/20 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
G06Q20/1085 (EP,US);
G06Q20/14 (EP,US);
G07F19/203 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/25] | G06F17/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRZWECKKIOSK UND VERFAHREN | [2005/25] | English: | MULTI-PURPOSE KIOSK AND METHODS | [2005/25] | French: | KIOSQUE A MULTI-USAGES ET PROCEDES | [2005/25] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 24.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/02] | 06.09.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0139093 (FIRST DATA CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-4,12-16,19,20,24,25,29 * abstract ** page 3 - page 13 *; | [X]WO0211028 (EFT DATALINK INC [US]) [X] 1-29 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0016] - [0063] - [0103] *; | [X]WO0248839 (FIRST DATA CORP [US]) [X] 6-11 * abstract * * page 3 - page 9 * | International search | [Y]US5513117 (SMALL MAYNARD E [US]); | [Y]US2002082962 (FARRIS ROBERT G [US], et al) |