EP1474216 - LIGHT SIGNAL DEVICE FOR A MODEL TRACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebrüder Märklin & Cie. Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Holzheimer Strasse 8 73037 Göppingen / DE | [2004/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CZERWONKA, Ralf Stuifenstrasse 4 73111 Lauterstein / DE | 02 /
LÜCKE, Alexander Sommerweg 5 73066 Uhingen / DE | 03 /
NICKL, Klaus-Peter In den Lehrersgärten 57/1 73033 Göppingen / DE | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Karrais, Martin HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Karrais, Martin, Dr. HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03734673.1 | 16.01.2003 | [2004/46] | WO2003EP00389 | Priority number, date | DE2002104542 | 30.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10204542 | [2004/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03063992 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1474216 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1474216 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A63H19/32, A63H19/34, A63H33/06, A63H18/02 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
A63H19/34 (EP);
A63H18/026 (EP);
A63H19/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/46] | Title | German: | LICHTSIGNALVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE MODELLBAHN | [2004/46] | English: | LIGHT SIGNAL DEVICE FOR A MODEL TRACK | [2004/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SIGNALISATION POUR MODELE REDUIT DE VOIE | [2004/46] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/46] | 29.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.06.2005 | CZ | 29.06.2005 | EE | 29.06.2005 | FI | 29.06.2005 | GB | 29.06.2005 | IE | 29.06.2005 | IT | 29.06.2005 | NL | 29.06.2005 | SI | 29.06.2005 | SK | 29.06.2005 | TR | 29.06.2005 | BG | 29.09.2005 | DK | 29.09.2005 | GR | 29.09.2005 | SE | 29.09.2005 | ES | 10.10.2005 | PT | 07.12.2005 | HU | 30.12.2005 | BE | 31.01.2006 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/40] | CZ | 29.06.2005 | |
EE | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
GB | 29.06.2005 | ||
IE | 29.06.2005 | ||
IT | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
SI | 29.06.2005 | ||
SK | 29.06.2005 | ||
TR | 29.06.2005 | ||
BG | 29.09.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
HU | 30.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CZ | 29.06.2005 | |
EE | 29.06.2005 | ||
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
GB | 29.06.2005 | ||
IE | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
SI | 29.06.2005 | ||
SK | 29.06.2005 | ||
TR | 29.06.2005 | ||
BG | 29.09.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
HU | 30.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | CZ | 29.06.2005 | |
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
GB | 29.06.2005 | ||
IE | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
SI | 29.06.2005 | ||
SK | 29.06.2005 | ||
TR | 29.06.2005 | ||
BG | 29.09.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | CZ | 29.06.2005 | |
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
GB | 29.06.2005 | ||
IE | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
SI | 29.06.2005 | ||
SK | 29.06.2005 | ||
BG | 29.09.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CZ | 29.06.2005 | |
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
GB | 29.06.2005 | ||
IE | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
SI | 29.06.2005 | ||
SK | 29.06.2005 | ||
BG | 29.09.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | CZ | 29.06.2005 | |
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
IE | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
SI | 29.06.2005 | ||
SK | 29.06.2005 | ||
BG | 29.09.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | CZ | 29.06.2005 | |
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
IE | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
SI | 29.06.2005 | ||
BG | 29.09.2005 | ||
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | CZ | 29.06.2005 | |
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
IE | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
SI | 29.06.2005 | ||
BG | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | CZ | 29.06.2005 | |
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
NL | 29.06.2005 | ||
SI | 29.06.2005 | ||
BG | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | CZ | 29.06.2005 | |
FI | 29.06.2005 | ||
SI | 29.06.2005 | ||
BG | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 29.06.2005 | |
SI | 29.06.2005 | ||
BG | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
ES | 10.10.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 29.06.2005 | |
SI | 29.06.2005 | ||
BG | 29.09.2005 | ||
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 29.06.2005 | |
SE | 29.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 29.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE1253620 (BRAWA ARTUR BRAUN) [Y] 6* column 1, lines 19-35; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0104315 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,10,12-14 * page 3, lines 8-37 * * page 5, lines 6-33 * * page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 9; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]DE3423556 (REUTER FRITZ) [X] 1,2 * page 5, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 7 - page 3, paragraph 8 * * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 * [A] 3-7,11,14; | [XY]DE19834884 (KENSCH KARLHEINZ [DE]) [X] 1,4 * column 1, lines 15-37; figure 2 * * column 2, lines 1-25 * * column 5, lines 3-15 * [Y] 6 |