EP1481233 - A METHOD AND DEVICE TO ASCERTAIN PHYSICAL CHARACTERISTICS OF POROUS MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABERDEEN UNIVERSITY Auris Business Centre, 23 St. Machar Drive Aberdeen AB24 3RY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Aberdeen University Auris Business Centre, 23 St. Machar Drive Aberdeen AB24 3RY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hurst, Andrew, c/o University of Aberdeen Meston Building, King's College Aberdeen AB24 3UE / GB | 02 /
Grandjean, Valerie, c/o University of Aberdeen Meston Building, King's College Aberdeen AB24 3UE / GB | 03 /
Kovalchuk, Alexander, c/o University of Aberdeen Fraser Noble Building, King's College Aberdeen AB24 3UE / GB | 04 /
Player, Michael, c/o University of Aberdeen Fraser Noble Buildning, King's College Aberdeen AB24 3UE / GB | 05 /
Watson, John, c/o University of Aberdeen Fraser Noble Building, King's College Aberdeen AB24 3UE / GB | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London, W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London, W1U 6FQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/49] | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street London W1M 1FD / GB | ||
Former [2004/49] | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03734777.0 | 31.01.2003 | [2004/49] | WO2003GB00447 | Priority number, date | GB20020002266 | 31.01.2002 Original published format: GB 0202266 | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03065017 | Date: | 07.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1481233 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/08, G01N33/24, G06T7/00 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
G01N33/24 (EP,US);
G06T7/0002 (EP,US);
G06T7/0004 (EP,US);
G06T7/41 (EP,US);
G06T7/586 (EP,US);
G06T7/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERMITTLUNG PHYSIKALISCHER EIGENSCHAFTEN PORÖSER MEDIEN | [2004/49] | English: | A METHOD AND DEVICE TO ASCERTAIN PHYSICAL CHARACTERISTICS OF POROUS MEDIA | [2004/49] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'IDENTIFIER DES CARACTERISTIQUES PHYSIQUES D'UN MILIEU POREUX | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 16.08.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.03.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4918739 (LORENTE MARIA A [VE], et al) [A] 1,8,15,19 * column 1, line 15 - line 23 * * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 20 * * column 6, line 45 - line 68 * * claims 1,3 *; | [A]US4783751 (EHRLICH ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1,8,19 * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 46 * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO0184126 (ELECTRO SCIENT IND INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4,8,19,20 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US6064478 (PAUL DETLEF [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,4,19,20,22 * column 2, line 24 - line 63 * * column 3, line 49 - line 65 * * column 4, line 50 - line 64 * * figures 1,4 * |