EP1513861 - NEW ETONOGESTREL ESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Organon Kloosterstraat 6 5349 AB Oss / NL | [2006/41] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE NIJS, Henrik N.V. Organon, P.O. Box 20 NL-5340 BH Oss / NL | 02 /
VAN DER VOORT, Hendrikus Adrianus Antonius N.V. Organon, P.O. Box 20 NL-5340 BH Oss / NL | 03 /
LEYSEN, Dirk N.V. Organon, P.O. Box 20 NL-5340 BH Oss / NL | 04 /
GROOTENHUIS, Arij Jan N.V. Organon, P.O. Box 20 NL-5340 BH Oss / NL | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Kraak, Hajo, et al N.V. Organon Global Patent Department P.O. Box 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | Kraak, Hajo, et al N.V. Organon Global Patent Department P.O. Box 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | ||
Former [2005/11] | Hogenbirk, Marijke, et al N.V. Organon, P.O. Box 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | Application number, filing date | 03735713.4 | 22.05.2003 | [2005/11] | WO2003EP50187 | Priority number, date | EP20020077119 | 30.05.2002 Original published format: EP 02077119 | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03102012 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1513861 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1513861 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07J1/00, A61K31/565, A61P5/34, A61P15/16, A61P15/18 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
C07J1/0096 (EP,US);
C07J1/00 (KR);
A61K31/565 (KR);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/16 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ETONOGESTRELESTER | [2005/11] | English: | NEW ETONOGESTREL ESTERS | [2005/11] | French: | NOUVEAUX ESTERS D'ETONOGESTREL | [2005/11] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 21.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0129947 (WORLD HEALTH ORG [CH]) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0737477 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [Y] 1-10,16 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE19613698 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10,16 * the whole document *; | [DA] - GUERIN J F ET AL, "INHIBITION OF SPERMATOGENESIS IN MEN USING VARIOUS COMBINATIONS OF ORAL PROGESTAGENS AND PERCUTANEOUS OR ORAL ANDROGENS", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ANDROLOGY, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, OXFORD, GB, (1988), vol. 11, no. 3, ISSN 0105-6263, pages 187 - 199, XP000917371 [DA] 3 * the whole document * |