EP1545473 - MODIFIED RELEASE, MULTIPLE UNIT DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ranbaxy Laboratories Limited 19, Nehru Place New Delhi 110 019 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD. 19, Nehru Place New Delhi 110 019 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Pratik Dr. Neelam Singh Shivpri, Damuchowk 842001 Muzaffarpur, Bihar / IN | 02 /
JAIN, Girish Kumar 4, Sharda Niketan Teachers Col ony Pitampura 110034 Dehli / IN | 03 /
RAMPAL, Ashok 14, Sewa Nagar Ram Tirath Road 143001 Amritsar, Punjab / IN | 04 /
NITHIYANANDAM, R. No. 24, Bairavan Kovil Street Dharapuram Erode District Periyar, Tamil Nadu638 65 6 / IN | 05 /
RAMAKRISHNAN, Sankar 24, River Bank Street Madukkur Thanjavur District Tamil Nadu 614 903 / IN | 06 /
RAGHUVANSHI, Rajeev Singh D8/8131 Vasant Kunj 110 070 New Delhi, Delhi / IN | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Cronin, Brian Harold John CRONIN Intellectual Property Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | Cronin, Brian Harold John Cronin Intellectual Property Route de Clémenty 62 1260 Nyon / CH | ||
Former [2005/26] | Gilholm, Stephen Philip Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd, 95 Park Lane Mayfair, London W1K 7TE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03735864.5 | 09.06.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003IB02186 | Priority number, date | IN2002DEL0706 | 07.06.2002 Original published format: IN DE07062002 | IN2002DEL1511 | 15.11.2002 Original published format: IN DE15112002 | IN2003DEL0603 | 06.03.2003 Original published format: IN DE06032003 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03103637 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1545473 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/24, A61K9/26, A61K9/28, A61K9/52, A61K31/4965, A61K31/137 | [2005/26] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Extension states | AL | 07.01.2005 | LT | 07.01.2005 | LV | 07.01.2005 | MK | 07.01.2005 | Title | German: | AUS MEHREREN EINZELEINHEITEN ZUSAMMENGESETZTES ARZNEIMITTEL MIT VERZÖGERTER FREISETZUNG | [2005/26] | English: | MODIFIED RELEASE, MULTIPLE UNIT DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS | [2005/26] | French: | SYSTEMES D'ADMINISTRATION DE MEDICAMENTS A UNITES MULTIPLES ET A LIBERATION MODIFIEE | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 01.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/26] | 04.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9912524 (NYCOMED DANMARK A S [DK], et al) [X] 1-9,12,29-35,37-39,68-70,73,76,77 * example 1 * * claim 51 * * page 33, line 31 - line 35 *; | [XD]US4713248 (KJORNAES KIM [DK], et al) [XD] 1-4,6-9,12,37,38,68,69,73,76 * examples 2,7 * * abstract *; | [XD]US5783215 (ARWIDSSON HANS [SE], et al) [XD] 1,4-6,9,13,14,29,30,32,33,37,38,68,69,73,76 * claim 1 * * examples 1,5 *; | [XP]WO03041692 (KARMA PHARM LTD [IL], et al) [XP] 1,4-11,13,14,29,30,32,73,108 * examples 1-4 * * claims 1,6 * |