EP1509405 - BINDER FOR SHEETS OR CARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IE | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Menumania s.a.s. di Alessandro Ledda & C. S.S. del Sempione, 15 20010 Pogliano M.se, MI / IT | [2007/26] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states Ledda, Alessandro Via La Guardia 31 20014 Nerviano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ledda, Alessandro Via La Guardia 31 20014 Nerviano / IT | [2007/26] |
Former [2005/09] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Adorno, Silvano, et al c/o SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Adorno, Silvano, et al c/o SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03735973.4 | 04.06.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003IT00351 | Priority number, date | IT2002MI01235 | 06.06.2002 Original published format: IT MI20021235 | [2005/09] | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03103984 | Date: | 18.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1509405 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1509405 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B42F13/00 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
B42F13/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORDNER FÜR BLÄTTER ODER KARTEN | [2005/09] | English: | BINDER FOR SHEETS OR CARDS | [2005/09] | French: | RELIURE POUR FEUILLES OU CARTES | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2003 | Translation filed | 24.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 05.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 15.08.2007 | CY | 15.08.2007 | CZ | 15.08.2007 | EE | 15.08.2007 | FI | 15.08.2007 | LI | 15.08.2007 | RO | 15.08.2007 | SK | 15.08.2007 | BG | 15.11.2007 | PT | 15.01.2008 | [2015/21] |
Former [2009/34] | CH | 15.08.2007 | |
CY | 15.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CH | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
EE | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CH | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
RO | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CH | 15.08.2007 | |
CZ | 15.08.2007 | ||
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
SK | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
PT | 15.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CH | 15.08.2007 | |
FI | 15.08.2007 | ||
LI | 15.08.2007 | ||
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 15.08.2007 | |
BG | 15.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | BG | 15.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB216557 (DUNCAN & SON LTD G, et al); | [A]GB914588 (MOORE S MODERN METHODS LTD); | [X]FR1560739 (JAMES ARTUR LUNDIN) [X] 1,2,4-6,11 * page 1, line 53 - page 1, line 76 * * page 2, line 29 - page 2, line 44; figures 1,2,7 *; | [X]FR2795020 (LIAO CHUN CHING [TW]) [X] 1,2,4-6,11 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 10; figure 1 *; | [PX]DE10124840 (HINZ FABRIK GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1,2,4-7,10,11 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 43; figures 1-3,6,8,9 * |