EP1542265 - MASK AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOIKE, Kaoru c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03736139.1 | 10.06.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003JP07377 | Priority number, date | JP20020186232 | 26.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002186232 | [2005/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004003985 | Date: | 08.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1542265 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/265 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
G03F1/20 (EP,US);
H01L21/265 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2005/42] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MASKE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2005/24] | English: | MASK AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2005/24] | French: | MASQUE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIF A SEMICONDUCTEUR | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2005 | Translation filed | 17.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 05.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/31] | 12.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS58106822 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]US4448865 (BOHLEN HARALD [DE], et al); | [X]JPH04243118 (FUJITSU LTD); | [X]US5728492 (KAWATA SHINTARO [JP]); | [A]JPH10207045 (NIKON CORP); | [A]US6319636 (HAM YOUNG MOG [KR]); | [Y]US2002058400 (SUGURO KYOICHI [JP], et al) |